This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 05:37:40 (UTC).

Troy Henry v. VDOC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Troy Henry filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against VDOC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6009

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent

JOE COAKLEY, Warden- Hazelton- Federal Bureau of Prisons

Petitioner / Appellant

TROY TERRELL HENRY

Beaver, WV 25813-0000

Respondent / Appellee

VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Troy Terrell Henry

Attorney at FCI BECKLEY

P. O. Box 350

Beaver, WV 25813-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Elizabeth Kiernan Fitzgerald

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00003-HEH-RCY. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/27/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:01 PM]

#5

(#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Troy Terrell Henry FCI BECKLEY FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 350 Beaver, WV 25813-0000 and Elizabeth Kiernan Fitzgerald. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:12 PM]

4 #2

IFP Application

4 #1

Fee Notice

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 01/16/2020. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:07 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Troy Terrell Henry FCI BECKLEY FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 350 Beaver, WV 25813-0000 and Elizabeth Kiernan Fitzgerald. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FEE NOTICE issued to Troy Terrell Henry - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/03/2020. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00003-HEH-RCY. Mailed to: Troy Terrell Henry FCI BECKLEY FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 350 Beaver, WV 25813-0000 and Elizabeth Kiernan Fitzgerald. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 01/16/2020. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • (#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00003-HEH-RCY. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? Yes. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00003-HEH-RCY. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/27/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6009] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.