This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:22 (UTC).

Troche v. LaManna

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Troche filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against LaManna. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2172

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

Jamie LaManna

Petitioner / Appellant

Felix Troche

Stormville, NY 12582

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Glenn Green

Attorney at Suffolk County District Attorney's Office

Arthur M. Cromarty Court Complex, 200 Center Drive

Riverhead, NY 11901

Thomas Costello Esq.

Attorney at Suffolk County District Attorney's Office

Criminal Courts Building, 200 Center Drive

Riverhead, NY 11901

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Felix Troche

Attorney at Green Haven Correctional Facility

594 Route 216, P.O. Box 4000

Stormville, NY 12582

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2612055] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:36 PM]

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635536] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:56 AM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE, to Appellee Jamie LaManna, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2635553] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:02 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2612045] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:34 PM]

13 #2

Affidavit of Service

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#18

(#18) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant 60 day extension to file motion for COA [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Felix Troche, by MHP, FILED. [2649316][18] [19-2172] [Entered: 09/06/2019 02:57 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635551] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:01 AM]

#8

(#8) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635549] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:00 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612051] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:35 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2618664] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:39 AM]

13 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant 60 day extension to file motion for COA [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Felix Troche, by MHP, FILED. [2649316][18] [19-2172] [Entered: 09/06/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY, Thomas Costello, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Glenn Green, SUBSTITUTED.[2638708] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jamie LaManna, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by US mail. [2636728] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE, to Appellee Jamie LaManna, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2635553] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635551] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635549] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Felix Troche, FILED. Service date 08/05/2019 by US mail.[2635536] [19-2172] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2618664] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2612058] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2612055] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612051] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2612045] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Felix Troche, FILED. [2612037] [19-2172] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.