This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/19/2020 at 06:00:14 (UTC).

Triangle Cayman Asset Company v. LG and AC, Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LG and AC, Corp . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1284

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant

ANIBAL COLON-SANTIAGO

Canovanas, PR 00729

Defendant / Appellants

LIVIAM MARGARITA CASILLAS-COLON

LG AND AC, CORP.

LEONARDO GOMEZ-VELEZ

3Rd Party Defendant

ORIENTAL BANK

Plaintiff / Appellee

TRIANGLE CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY

Interested Party

BETTY APONTE DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Anibal Colon-Santiago

11 Guayacan St

Canovanas, PR 00729

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bamily Lopez-Ortiz

Attorney at Lopez Toro, Estudio de Derecho

Po Box 635

Rio Grande, PR 00745

Marie Elsie Lopez-Adames

Attorney at Bufete Gonzalez Lopez & Lopez Adames

1126 Ashford Ave, Ste C-10

San Juan, PR 00907-0000

3Rd Party Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Antonio L. Roig Lorenzo

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Karena Montes-Berrios

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Carolina Velaz-Rivero

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIANGLES JOINDER TO ORIENTALS MOTION TO DISMISS FILED IN 19-1251, AND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2020. [20-1284] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (IJL) [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Triangle Cayman Asset Company has filed a motion to vacate the bankruptcy stay entered in Appeal Nos. 19-1251 and 19-1786 in light of the dismissal of the bankruptcy proceeding initiated by defendants Leonardo Gomez-Velez and Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon. Upon consideration, Triangle's motion is granted , and the stay entered in Appeal Nos. 19-1251 and 19-1786 is vacated . A motion to dismiss is pending in Appeal No. 19-1251, as are responses to a previously entered order to show cause. Any response to the motion to dismiss should be filed within ten days of entry of this order . The matters of potential consolidation and a briefing schedule will be taken up once the motion to dismiss and order to show cause responses have been addressed. [19-1251, 19-1786, 20-1284] (GB) [Entered: 05/12/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/19/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Marie Elsie Lopez-Adames for LG and AC, Corp., Leonardo Gomez-Velez and Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon. [20-1284] (GB) [Entered: 05/05/2020 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2020. [20-1284] (LCM) [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2020. [20-1284] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 04/21/2020. (IJL) [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Carolina Velaz-Rivero. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2020. [20-1284] (CV) [Entered: 04/16/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2020. [20-1284] (IJL) [Entered: 04/16/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS report and MOTION to Vacate the Stays in 19-1786, 19-1251 filed by Appellant Triangle Cayman Asset Company in 19-1786, Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company in 19-1251, 20-1284. Certificate of service dated 04/15/2020. [19-1786, 19-1251, 20-1284] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (IJL) [Entered: 04/15/2020 08:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp. filed by Attorney Bamily Lopez Ortiz. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2020. [20-1284] (BL) [Entered: 04/03/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp. filed by Attorney Ms. Bamily Lopez-Ortiz of LOPEZ TORO Law. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2020. [20-1284] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 04/03/2020. (BL) [Entered: 04/01/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp.. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2020. [20-1284] (BL) [Entered: 04/01/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Carlos R. Baralt Suarez. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2020. [20-1284] (CRB) [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #248) filed by Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp.. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/03/2020 . [20-1284] (GB) [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG AND AC, CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant