This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/07/2019 at 06:06:32 (UTC).

Triangle Cayman Asset Co. v. LG and AC, Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Triangle Cayman Asset Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LG and AC, Corp . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1251

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant

ANIBAL COLON-SANTIAGO

Defendant / Appellants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

LIVIAM MARGARITA CASILLAS-COLON

LG AND AC, CORP.

LEONARDO GOMEZ-VELEZ

Plaintiff / Appellee

TRIANGLE CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY

3Rd Party Defendant

ORIENTAL BANK

Interested Party

BETTY APONTE DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rafael A. Toro-Arsuaga

Attorney at Navas & Rodriguez PSC

1225 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 1005

San Juan, PR 00907-0000

Defendant / Appellant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Bamily Lopez-Ortiz

Attorney at Lopez Toro, Estudio de Derecho

Po Box 635

Rio Grande, PR 00745

Marie Elsie Lopez-Adames

Attorney at Bufete Gonzalez Lopez & Lopez Adames

1126 Ashford Ave, Ste C-10

San Juan, PR 00907-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Antonio L. Roig Lorenzo

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Karena Montes

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

Mcs Plaza, 255 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 500

San Juan, PR 00917

Karena Montes-Berrios

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

3Rd Party Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 05/07/2019. [19-1251] (TS) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Marie Elsie Lopez-Adames for LG and AC, Corp., Leonardo Gomez-Velez and Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon and Antonio L. Roig Lorenzo for Triangle Cayman Asset Company. [19-1251] (TS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/08/2019 , the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Marie Elsie Lopez-Adames for LG and AC, Corp., Leonardo Gomez-Velez and Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon and Antonio L. Roig Lorenzo for Triangle Cayman Asset Company. [19-1251] (TS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Karena Montes Berrios. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2019. [19-1251] (KM) [Entered: 03/24/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triangle Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1251] (LCM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp.. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2019. [19-1251] (BL) [Entered: 03/09/2019 06:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp. filed by Attorney Bamily Lopez Ortiz. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2019. [19-1251] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. . [19-1251] (BL) [Entered: 03/09/2019 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Oriental Bank. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2019. [19-1251] (CRB) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Carlos R. Baralt Suarez. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2019. [19-1251] (CRB) [Entered: 03/08/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2019. [19-1251] (AF) [Entered: 03/08/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #218) filed by Appellants Liviam Margarita Casillas-Colon, Leonardo Gomez-Velez and LG and AC, Corp.. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 03/22/2019. [19-1251] (TS) [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIANGLE CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant