This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:04:13 (UTC).

Tri Huynh v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Tri Huynh filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15211

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WAL-MART STORES, INC., a Delaware Corporation

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., a Delaware Corporation

WALMART.COM USA LLC, a Delaware Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

TRI MINH HUYNH

Bellevue, WA 98006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tri Minh Huynh

4015 134Th Ave Se

Bellevue, WA 98006

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 2/18/20. [11601646] (CW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:45 AM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) Streamlined request [3] by Appellant Mr. Tri Minh Huynh to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Tri Minh Huynh opening brief due 05/13/2020. Appellees Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Walmart.com USA LLC answering brief due 06/12/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11654949] (DLM) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Mr. Tri Minh Huynh. New requested due date is 05/13/2020. [11654863] [20-15211] (Huynh, Tri) [Entered: 04/07/2020 07:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 2/18/20. [11601646] (CW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tri Minh Huynh opening brief due 04/13/2020. Appellees Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Walmart.com USA LLC answering brief due 05/12/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11595937] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less