This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2019 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

Trent Sherman v. Michigan Department, et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Trent Sherman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1405

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEAN MOLNAR

JOSEPH MOLNAR

DANIEL HOPKINS

GARY HAGLER

MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES

JAMES GORNO

KEITH CREAGH

WILLIAM WEBSTER

CHRISTOPHER LYNCH

Plaintiff / Appellant

TRENT DOUGLAS SHERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Paul Bock

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

525 W. Ottawa Street, Suite 640 G. Mennen Williams Building

Lansing, MI 48909-0000

Luanne Laemmerman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark Roy Bendure

Attorney at Bendure & Thomas

15450 E. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 110

Grosse Pointe Park, MI 48230

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Mr. Mark Roy Bendure, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/05/2019, appellee brief now due 08/05/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:38 PM]

#17

(#17) MOTION filed by Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Trent Douglas Sherman to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/06/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:25 PM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Keith Creagh, James Gorno, Gary Hagler, Daniel Hopkins, Christopher Lynch, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Dean Molnar, Joseph Molnar and William Webster by Daniel P. Bock. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (DPB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:55 AM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Keith Creagh, James Gorno, Gary Hagler, Daniel Hopkins, Christopher Lynch, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Dean Molnar, Joseph Molnar and William Webster by Luanne Laemmerman. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (LL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:52 AM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Michigan Department of Natural Resources by Daniel P. Bock. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (DPB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:21 AM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Michigan Department of Natural Resources by Luanne Laemmerman. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (LL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:04 AM]

#11

(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Certificate of Service:04/30/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:04 PM]

#10

(#10) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/06/2019. appellee brief now due 07/05/2019. (MLB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]

#9

(#9) The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 05/23/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:44 AM]

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Certificate of Service:04/24/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:37 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman Certificate of Service: 04/23/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:55 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman by Mark R. Bendure. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:11 PM]

#5

(#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/14/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:56 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/28/2019, appellee brief due 06/26/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:17 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:07 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Mr. Mark Roy Bendure, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/05/2019, appellee brief now due 08/05/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION filed by Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Trent Douglas Sherman to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/06/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#16) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Keith Creagh, James Gorno, Gary Hagler, Daniel Hopkins, Christopher Lynch, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Dean Molnar, Joseph Molnar and William Webster by Daniel P. Bock. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (DPB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Keith Creagh, James Gorno, Gary Hagler, Daniel Hopkins, Christopher Lynch, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Dean Molnar, Joseph Molnar and William Webster by Luanne Laemmerman. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (LL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Michigan Department of Natural Resources by Daniel P. Bock. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (DPB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Michigan Department of Natural Resources by Luanne Laemmerman. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2019. [19-1405] (LL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Certificate of Service:04/30/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/06/2019. appellee brief now due 07/05/2019. (MLB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 05/23/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Certificate of Service:04/24/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Roy Bendure for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman Certificate of Service: 04/23/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman by Mark R. Bendure. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2019. [19-1405] (MRB) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/14/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • (#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/28/2019, appellee brief due 06/26/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Trent Douglas Sherman. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less