This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 06:10:08 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Co v. CRM

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CRM. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15862

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation

Defendant / Appellee

SALESFORCE.COM, INC., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Emily Victoria Cuatto

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Mitchell C. Tilner

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Mark D. Peterson

Attorney at CATES PETERSON LLP

4100 Newport Place, Suite 230

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David B. Goodwin

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Hannah M. Chartoff

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Jeffrey Michael Davidson Esquire

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/19/2021, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America opening brief due 09/10/2021. Appellee SalesForce.com, Inc. answering brief due 10/12/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12147712] (VS) [Entered: 06/17/2021 03:46 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/17/2021, 3:00 p.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America opening brief due 08/11/2021. Appellee SalesForce.com, Inc. answering brief due 09/10/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12137439] (VS) [Entered: 06/08/2021 11:59 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/08/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12119261] (VS) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:53 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/18/2021. [12116965] [21-15862] (Tilner, Mitchell) [Entered: 05/18/2021 02:07 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/19/2021, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America opening brief due 09/10/2021. Appellee SalesForce.com, Inc. answering brief due 10/12/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12147712] (VS) [Entered: 06/17/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/17/2021, 3:00 p.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America opening brief due 08/11/2021. Appellee SalesForce.com, Inc. answering brief due 09/10/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12137439] (VS) [Entered: 06/08/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/08/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12119261] (VS) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/18/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12117398]. [21-15862] (AD) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/18/2021. [12116965] [21-15862] (Tilner, Mitchell) [Entered: 05/18/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/20/2021. Appellant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America opening brief due 07/12/2021. Appellee SalesForce.com, Inc. answering brief due 08/11/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12111733] (JBS) [Entered: 05/13/2021 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Michael Davidson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B Goodwin