This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/24/2022 at 18:47:43 (UTC).

Trading Technologies Intl. v. Rosenthal Collins Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 Trading Technologies Intl filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Rosenthal Collins Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-2223

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

ROSENTHAL COLLINS GROUP, LLC

FUTUREPATH TRADING LLC

TRADEHELM, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

TRADING TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

TRADESTATION SECURITIES, INC.

IBG LLC

INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC

TRADESTATION GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Leif R. Sigmond Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Steven Borsand

Attorney at Trading Technologies International, Inc.

222 South Riverside, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael David Gannon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer Kurcz

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Cole Bradley Richter

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea Smith LLP

656 W Randolph, Floor 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Danielle J. Healey

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Bailey Kathleen Harris

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Adam J. Kessel

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210

Michael Brett Levin

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Natalie J. Morgan

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC

12235 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Gideon A. Schor

20 W 72Nd Street

New York, NY 10023

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Costs taxed in the amount of $461.81. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [384030] [CAB] [Entered: 11/17/2016 10:17 AM]

#68

RESTRICTED

67 #4

Supreme Court Information Sheet

67 #3

Rehearing Q&A

67 #2

Opinion filed

67 #1

Notice of Entry of Judgment

#65

(#65) Letter from Appellees TradeStation Group, Inc. and TradeStation Securities, Inc. Status of related ongoing proceedings. Service: 09/16/2016 by email. [367363] [Danielle Healey] [Entered: 09/19/2016 12:38 PM]

#60

(#60) Notice from Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (Oct. 5-7, 2016). Service: 08/12/2016 by email. [358329] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 08/12/2016 10:06 AM]

#57

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

53 #5

Joint Appendix, Vol. 5

53 #4

Joint Appendix, Vol. 4

53 #3

Joint Appendix, Vol. 3

53 #2

Joint Appendix, Vol. 2

53 #1

Joint Appendix, Vol. 1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Costs taxed in the amount of $461.81. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [384030] [CAB] [Entered: 11/17/2016 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Bill of Costs for Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. Service: 10/25/2016 by email. Objection to Bill of Costs due on 11/14/2016. [377493] [Michael Levin] [Entered: 10/25/2016 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed. (FCR 36). (For the Court: Newman,Circuit Judge; Lourie,Circuit Judge and Clevenger,Circuit Judge). [372950] [IW] [Entered: 10/11/2016 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Docket(#66) Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by Mr. Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. for Trading Technologies International, Inc. and David J. Healey for TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Group, Inc.. Panel: Judge: Newman , Judge: Lourie , Judge: Clevenger. [371279] [JCP] [Entered: 10/04/2016 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Letter from Appellees TradeStation Group, Inc. and TradeStation Securities, Inc. Status of related ongoing proceedings. Service: 09/16/2016 by email. [367363] [Danielle Healey] [Entered: 09/19/2016 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Docket(#64) Response to oral argument order from the Appellees TradeStation Group, Inc. and TradeStation Securities, Inc.. designating David J. Healey as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [366807] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 09/15/2016 08:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Docket(#63) Response to oral argument order from the Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. designating David J. Healey as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [366800] [Michael Levin] [Entered: 09/15/2016 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Docket(#62) Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. designating Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 10 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 5 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [366571] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 09/15/2016 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1610I. Case scheduled Oct 04, 2016 10:00 a.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 201. Response to oral argument order due: 09/15/2016. Counsel should check-in 30 minutes prior to the opening of the session. Please review the # Oral Argument Order. [360467] THIS NOTICE APPLIES TO CASE(S): [16-1182, 16-1342, 16-1407, 16-2223] [JAB] [Entered: 08/19/2016 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice from Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (Oct. 5-7, 2016). Service: 08/12/2016 by email. [358329] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 08/12/2016 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for David J. Healey as principal counsel for Appellees TradeStation Group, Inc. and TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2016 by email. [344557] [Danielle Healey] [Entered: 06/17/2016 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION of Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. to expedite case. Response/Opposition is due 06/30/2016, to expedite briefing schedule. Response/Opposition is due 06/30/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/16/2016 by email. [344447] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/16/2016 by email. [344444] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/16/2016 by email. [344442] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Steven F. Borsand as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/16/2016 by email. [344441] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Michael D. Gannon as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 04/16/2016 by email. [344440] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Jennifer M. Kurcz as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 04/16/2016 by email. [344439] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. as principal counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 04/16/2016 by email. [344438] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Cole B. Richter as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 04/16/2016 by email. [344437] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/15/2016. [344367] Entry of Appearance due 06/30/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/30/2016. Docketing Statement due 06/30/2016. Appellant's brief is due 08/15/2016. [CAB] [Entered: 06/16/2016 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Futurepath Trading, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rosenthal Collins Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADESTATION GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADESTATION SECURITIES, INC. is a litigant