This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/20/2021 at 06:49:51 (UTC).

Trading Technologies Int'l v. IBG LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 Trading Technologies Int'l filed an Other lawsuit against IBG LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-2054

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

TRADING TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Appellees

INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC

IBG LLC

TRADESTATION SECURITIES, INC.

IBFX, INC.

TRADESTATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

TRADESTATION GROUP, INC.

Intervenor

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael David Gannon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Cole Bradley Richter

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea Smith LLP

656 W Randolph, Floor 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

Jay Quentin Knobloch

Attorney at Trading Technologies International, Inc.

222 South Riverside, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer Kurcz

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Leif R. Sigmond Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Alaina J. Lakawicz

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street, Cira Centre, 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

Steven Borsand

Attorney at Trading Technologies International, Inc.

222 South Riverside, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

Appellee Attorneys

Jon Wright

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Richard M. Bemben

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Robert Evan Sokohl

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Byron Leroy Pickard Esq.

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Intervenor Attorneys

Katherine Twomey Allen

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Farheena Yasmeen Rasheed

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Joseph Matal

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Mark R. Freeman

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Scott R. McIntosh

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Joseph H. Hunt

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 146, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#141

#140

#137

#136

#134

#133

#129

#128

#127

#125

#124

#122

#120

#118

#117

#116

#115

#114

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) The petition for writ of certiorari, [19-120], filed on 07/24/2019, was Denied on 10/07/2019. [640899] [17-1732, 17-2052, 17-2054, 17-2565] [JAB] [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) Petition for writ of Certiorari filed on 07/24/2019, and placed on the docket 07/25/2019, in the Supreme Court of the United States. Supreme Court #: 19-120, IBG LLC, et al. v. Trading Technologies International, Inc. [623993] [17-1732, 17-2052, 17-2054, 17-2565] [JAB] [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) Mandate issued to the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [605401] [PBC] [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) ORDER filed denying [ # 134 ] petition for panel rehearing filed by IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC; denying [ # 134 ] petition for en banc rehearing filed by IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [603995] [PBC] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) 18 paper copies of the response [ # 137 ] received from Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. [597546] [JAB] [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Docket(#138) Notice to counsel for Cross-Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. in 17-1732, 17-2052, Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. in 17-2054, 17-2565: The record of this case indicates that the paper copies of the response to rehearing petition (see Fed. Cir. R. 35(c)(4)) have not been filed. The required paper copies should be received by the court on or before 04/05/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [597505] [17-1732, 17-2052, 17-2054, 17-2565] [JAB] [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) RESPONSE of Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. to the petition for panel rehearing [ # 134 ] filed by Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC, petition for en banc rehearing [ # 134 ] filed by Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. Service: 03/28/2019 by email, US mail. [596341] [17-2054] [Michael Gannon] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) The court invites a response from Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc. to the petition for panel rehearing, petition for en banc rehearing filed by Appellees in 17-2054. The response is due on or before 03/28/2019. [592911] [JAB] [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) 18 paper copies of the petition for panel rehearing [ # 134 ], petition for en banc rehearing [ # 134 ] received from Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. [589627] [PBC] [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) Petition for panel rehearing, for en banc rehearing filed by Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. Service: 02/28/2019 by email, US mail. The paper copies of the petition must be filed within two business days (see Fed. Cir. R. 35(c)(4).The required paper copies should be received by the court on or before 03/04/2019 [589484] [17-2054] [Robert Sokohl] [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Jennifer M. Kurcz as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435815] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/01/2017 07:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Cole B. Richter as of counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435814] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/01/2017 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. as principal counsel for Appellant Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435813] [Cole Richter] [Entered: 06/01/2017 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Jon E. Wright as of counsel for Appellees IBFX, Inc., IBG LLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, TradeStation Group, Inc., TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435786] [Jon Wright] [Entered: 06/01/2017 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Richard M. Bemben as of counsel for Appellees IBFX, Inc., IBG LLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, TradeStation Group, Inc., TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435784] [Richard Bemben] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellees IBFX, Inc., IBG LLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, TradeStation Group, Inc., TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435782] [Robert Sokohl] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees IBFX, Inc., TradeStation Group, Inc., TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435781] [Robert Sokohl] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees IBG LLC and Interactive Brokers LLC. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435778] [Robert Sokohl] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Robert E. Sokohl as principal counsel for Appellees IBFX, Inc., IBG LLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, TradeStation Group, Inc., TradeStation Securities, Inc. and TradeStation Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435777] [Robert Sokohl] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/15/2017. [432629] Entry of Appearance due 06/01/2017. Certificate of Interest due 06/01/2017. Docketing Statement due 06/01/2017. Certified List due 06/27/2017. [MJL] [Entered: 05/18/2017 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IBFX, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADESTATION GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADESTATION SECURITIES, INC. is a litigant