This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 06:17:29 (UTC).

Tracy Smith, et al v. Chris Hatcher, et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Tracy Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chris Hatcher. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10567

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL HEATH, In His Individual and Official Capacity as Jail Administrator for the Glynn County Sheriff's Office

CHRIS HATCHER, In His Individual and Official Capacity as an Officer of the Glynn County Police Department

E. NEAL JUMP, In His Individual and Official Capacity as the Sheriff of Glynn County

RANDY AUSTIN, Major, In His Individual and Official Capacity as Detention Officer for the Glynn County Sheriff's Office

STEPHANIE SHUMAN, Lieutenant for the Glynn County Sheriffs Office , In her Individual and Official Capacity

ANDREA BROWNING

GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Plaintiff / Appellants

CANDACE A. SMITH

TRACY D. L. C. SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Blackerby

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Patrick T. O'Connor

Attorney at Oliver Maner, LLP

218 W State St, Po Box 10186

Savannah, GA 31412

Stuart Fallin Sumner

Attorney at Oliver Maner, LLP

218 W State St, Po Box 10186

Savannah, GA 31412

Roger A. Chalmers

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James A. Yancey Jr.

Attorney at James A. Yancey, Jr., Attorney at Law, PC

704 G St

Brunswick, GA 31520-6749

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9346064-1] [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/30/2021 10:16 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Roger Chalmers for Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roger A. Chalmers for Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:41 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:17 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:00 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James A. Yancey, Jr. for Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:55 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 71

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9346064-1] [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/30/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Roger Chalmers for Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roger A. Chalmers for Andrea Browning and Georgia Department of Human Services [21-10567] (ECF: Roger Chalmers) [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 03/12/2021 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by James A. Yancey, Jr. for Tracy D. L. C. Smith and Candace A. Smith. The complete civil appeal statement form was not uploaded. Counsel musts file the complete civil appeal statement form within 3 days of this notice. [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James A. Yancey, Jr. for Tracy D. L. C. Smith and Candace A. Smith. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James A. Yancey, Jr. for Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James A. Yancey, Jr. for Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith. [21-10567] (ECF: James Yancey) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Candace A. Smith and Tracy D. L. C. Smith on 02/17/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/30/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/04/2021 as to Appellant Candace A. Smith. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/18/2021 as to Appellees [Entered: 02/23/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, EX REL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A Yancey, Jr.