This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/20/2021 at 06:44:04 (UTC).

Torey Jarrett v. Service Employees Internationa, et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Torey Jarrett filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Service Employees Internationa. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35133

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MARION COUNTY

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 503, a labor organization

Plaintiff / Appellant

TOREY JARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Curtis Michael Glaccum Esquire

Attorney at Marion County Legal Counsel

555 Court St. Ne, Po Box 14500

Salem, OR 97301

James S. Coon Esquire

Attorney at Swanson, Thomas, Coon & Newton

820 Southwest Second Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James G. Abernathy

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Rebekah Millard

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12029236] (VS) [Entered: 03/09/2021 11:28 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/18/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12023927] (VS) [Entered: 03/04/2021 09:33 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Torey Jarrett Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/26/2021. [12018521] [21-35133] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 02/26/2021 03:32 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet for Attorneys

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Torey Jarrett to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Torey Jarrett opening brief due 05/19/2021. Appellees Marion County and Service Employees International Union Local 503 answering brief due 06/18/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12074013] (BG) [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Torey Jarrett. New requested due date is 05/19/2021. [12073987] [21-35133] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12029236] (VS) [Entered: 03/09/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/18/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12023927] (VS) [Entered: 03/04/2021 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/26/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12018815]. [21-35133] (AD) [Entered: 02/26/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Torey Jarrett Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/26/2021. [12018521] [21-35133] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 02/26/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Torey Jarrett Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/26/2021. Appellant Torey Jarrett opening brief due 04/19/2021. Appellees Marion County and Service Employees International Union Local 503 answering brief due 05/19/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12009907] (JPD) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marion County is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebekah Millard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James G. Abernathy