This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/28/2021 at 06:02:24 (UTC).

Tony Jazayeri v. Avaya Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Tony Jazayeri filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Avaya Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2233

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

STEVE DENO

NIKHIL DESHPANDE

AVAYA INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

TONY JAZAYERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shannon N. Attalla Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Terry D. Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

Jocelyn L. Womack Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Bryan M. Killian Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 800 North

Washington, DC 20004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jessamyne M. Simon Esq.

Attorney at Simon Law Firm

Two Bala Plaza, Suite 300

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Vincent J. Pentima Esq.

30 Rock Hill Road

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #2

Mediation Instructions

13 #1

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

#12

#11

10 #3

Court Order Granting Summary Judgment

10 #2

Court Order Motion to Compel

10 #1

Court Memorandum Summary Judgment

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order 5/28/21

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shannon N. Attalla on behalf of Appellee(s) Avaya, Inc., Steve Deno, and Nikhil Deshpande. [21-2233] (SNA) [Entered: 07/27/2021 12:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bryan Killian on behalf of Appellee(s) Avaya, Inc., Nikhil Deshpande, and Steve Deno. [21-2233] (BMK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Tony Jazayeri advising this court that. [21-2233] (VJP) [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Vincent J. Pentima, Esq. for Tony Jazayeri and Jessamyne M. Simon, Esq. for Tony Jazayeri requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/28/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 07/14/2021 08:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Tony Jazayeri. [21-2233] (JMS) [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Tony Jazayeri. [21-2233] (JMS) [Entered: 07/14/2021 12:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Tony Jazayeri. [21-2233] (JMS) [Entered: 07/14/2021 12:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessamyne M. Simon on behalf of Appellant(s) Tony Jazayeri. [21-2233] (JMS) [Entered: 07/12/2021 10:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Tony Jazayeri. [21-2233] (JMS) [Entered: 07/11/2021 10:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Avaya Inc. [21-2233] (TDJ) [Entered: 07/09/2021 04:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Terry D. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Avaya, Inc., Steve Deno, and Nikhil Deshpande. [21-2233] (TDJ) [Entered: 07/09/2021 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vincent J. Pentima on behalf of Appellant(s) Tony Jarazeri. [21-2233] (VJP) [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Tony Jazayeri in District Court No. 2-19-cv-06003. (CJG) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less