This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/04/2022 at 05:47:15 (UTC).

Tony Jackson v. Joseph McCray, et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Tony Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Joseph McCray. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1971

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TONY JACKSON

Dixon, IL 61021-0000

Defendant / Appellees

JOSEPH MCCRAY, C/O, also known as MCCRAW

DALTON EUTSEY, C/O

JOHN DOE, Sergeant, Tact Team Supervisor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tony Jackson

Attorney at DIXON CORRECTIONAL CENTER

2600 N. Brinton Avenue, P.O. Box 1200

Dixon, IL 61021-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nadine J. Wichern

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Rights Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) No attorney(s) added for Appellee John Doe, per District Court docket. [2] [7240035] [22-1971] (CG) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Tony Jackson by 06/08/2022. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 07/01/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 06/15/2022. [1] [7240021] [22-1971] (CG) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadine J. Wichern