This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2019 at 06:03:57 (UTC).

Tom Dunne, Jr. v. Resource Converting, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 Tom Dunne, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Resource Converting, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2982

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JWR, Inc.

Gary Brinkmann

Resource Converting, LLC

Tim Danley

NewWay Global Energy

Rick Kersey

Jerry Flickinger

Sebright Products, Inc.

David Wolf

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tom Dunne, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth S. Silker

Teresa Michelle Young

Steven Howard Schwartz

Travis James West

Nicole J. Lam

Gene J. Brockland Jr.

Thomas Frederick Koernke

Brian M. Wacker

Peter J. Dunne

Robert T. Plunkert

Martin John Buckley

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan R. Waldron

Reid Kelly Day

Barry L. Haith

Mitchell Martin

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mitchell Martin for Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. correcting [ # 4850901-2 ] motion ext of time to file document filed by Attorney. [4850902] [19-2982] (MM) [Entered: 11/11/2019 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Brief and Joint Appendix until 12/09/2019[4850901], filed by Attorney Mr. Mitchell Martin for Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. w/service 11/11/2019. [4850901] [19-2982] (MM) [Entered: 11/11/2019 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4845507-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Mitchell Martin. Brief of Tom Dunne Jr. due 11/18/2019. Appendix due on 11/18/2019. [4846218] [19-2982] (NDW) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mitchell Martin for Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. correcting [ # 4845507-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [4845883] [19-2982] (MM) [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 4845507-2 ], submitted by Mr. Mitchell Martin in 19-2982 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion. [19-2982] (BNW) [Entered: 10/25/2019 07:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/18/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Mitchell Martin for Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. w/service 10/24/2019. [4845507] [19-2982] (MM) [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/27/2019 [4835646] [19-2982] (JRW) [Entered: 09/27/2019 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mitchell A. Martin for Appellant Mr. Tom Dunne, Jr. w/service 09/25/2019 [4834525] [19-2982] (MM) [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee NewWay Global Energy. - FOR CAL [4832490] [19-2982] (MJB) [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee JWR. - FOR CAL [4832342] [19-2982] (TMY) [Entered: 09/18/2019 01:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Sebright Products. - FOR CAL [4830852] [19-2982] (GJB) [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robert T. Plunkert for Appellees Mr. Tim Danley, Mr. Rick Kersey and Resource Converting w/service 09/13/2019 [4830635] [19-2982] (RTP) [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Peter J. Dunne for Appellees Mr. Rick Kersey, Resource Converting and Mr. Tim Danley w/service 09/13/2019 [4830631] [19-2982] (PJD) [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Martin J. Buckley for Appellee NewWay Global Energy w/service 09/13/2019 [4830622] [19-2982] (MJB) [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Gene J. Brockland for Appellees Mr. Gary Brinkmann and Sebright Products w/service 09/13/2019 [4830581] [19-2982] (GJB) [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Steven H. Schwartz for Appellees JWR, Mr. Jerry Flickinger and Mr. David Wolf w/service 09/13/2019 [4830432] [19-2982] (SHS) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Teresa M. Young for Appellees Mr. Jerry Flickinger, JWR and Mr. David Wolf w/service 09/13/2019 [4830405] [19-2982] (TMY) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/23/2019. Appendix due 11/04/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Tom Dunne Jr. due 11/04/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4830377] [19-2982] (CMH) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order dated 5/24/2017, Order dated 11/5/2018, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 3/19/2019, and Memorandum & Order dated 8/9/2019. [4830373] [19-2982] (CMH) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4830340] [19-2982] (CMH) [Entered: 09/13/2019 10:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less