This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2021 at 06:01:33 (UTC).

Todd France v. Jason Bernstein

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Todd France filed an Other lawsuit against Jason Bernstein. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3425

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

TODD FRANCE

Defendant / Appellant

JASON BERNSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. Iaconelli Esq.

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John D. Folds Esq.

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz

901 K Street, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

William J. Clements Esq.

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Glenn A. Weiner Esq.

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John D. Comerford Esq.

Attorney at Dowd Bennett

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

James B. Martin Esq.

Attorney at Dowd Bennett

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

Craig C. Reilly Esq.

111 Oronoco Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Scott L. Grenoble Esq.

Attorney at Buzgon Davis Reed Charles & Huber

525 South 8Th Street, P.O. Box 49

Lebanon, PA 17042

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Iaconelli, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (GAW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:16 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn A. Weiner, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (GAW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:15 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William J. Clements, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (WJC) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:14 PM]

#13

(#13) NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Todd France requesting corrected and separate entries of appearances for Attorneys Weiner, Iaconelli and Clements. Compliance due 01/29/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:38 PM]

#11

(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to William J. Clements, Esq. for Todd France, John D. Folds, Esq. for Todd France and Michael A. Iaconelli, Esq. for Todd France requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/19/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/11/2021 04:17 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Letter to Clerk responding to Court's Order of December 8, 2020 (Doc. 03) filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 01/07/2021 09:16 AM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:30 PM]

8 #4

Attachment 3 - Doc 68

8 #3

Attachment 2 - Doc 67

8 #2

Attachment 1 - Doc 66

8 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:14 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:11 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James B. Martin on behalf of Appellant(s) Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JBM) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:08 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Comerford on behalf of Appellant(s) Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:05 PM]

#3

(#3) CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s) in the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:16 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#1

Civil Case Docketed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Iaconelli, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (GAW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn A. Weiner, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (GAW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William J. Clements, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425] (WJC) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Todd France requesting corrected and separate entries of appearances for Attorneys Weiner, Iaconelli and Clements. Compliance due 01/29/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn A. Weiner, Esq., Michael A. Iaconelli, Esq., William J. Clements, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Todd France. [20-3425]--[DOCUMENTS REMOVED - CORRECTED ENTRIES MADE - Edited 01/29/2021 by JK] (GAW) [Entered: 01/25/2021 08:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to William J. Clements, Esq. for Todd France, John D. Folds, Esq. for Todd France and Michael A. Iaconelli, Esq. for Todd France requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/19/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/11/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Letter to Clerk responding to Court's Order of December 8, 2020 (Doc. 03) filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 01/07/2021 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James B. Martin on behalf of Appellant(s) Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JBM) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Comerford on behalf of Appellant(s) Jason Bernstein. [20-3425] (JDC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s) in the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jason Bernstein in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01443. (JK) [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L. Grenoble

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Comerford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Blaine Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Crandall Reilly