This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 06:04:33 (UTC).

Tinika Warren v. DeVry University, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Tinika Warren filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against DeVry University, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12244

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TINIKA S. WARREN

Locust Grove, GA 30248

Defendant / Appellee

DEVRY UNIVERSITY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tinika S. Warren

4675 Bill Gardner Pkwy

Locust Grove, GA 30248

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tinika S. Warren. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:41 PM]

Open Document #5

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DE #20 Order

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DE #23 Order

Open Document #4

DE #21 Judgment

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tinika S. Warren. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:46 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tinika S. Warren. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tinika S. Warren. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Tinika S. Warren on 05/23/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/26/2019 as to Appellant Tinika S. Warren [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less