This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2020 at 06:02:42 (UTC).

Tina Winkler v. Medtronic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Tina Winkler filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2437

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

STEPHANIE LACONIA

KELLY WINKLER

TINA W. WINKLER, Individually and as Mother and Next Friend of J.W

MADELINE WINKLER

Defendant / Appellees

HEARTWARE, INC.

MEDTRONIC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John James Sellinger Sr.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott M. Ahmad

DaWanna LaShawn McCray

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

3 #1

Appearance of counsel

3 #2

Additional Document

#3

Additional Document

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/20/2020. Response brief due 03/19/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000672664] [19-2437] KH [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:21 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2437] LHP [Entered: 01/15/2020 03:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2437] MRB [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:27 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by DaWanna LaShawn McCray for Medtronic, Inc. and Heartware, Inc.. [1000653044] [19-2437] DaWanna McCray [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:35 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medtronic, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000653036] [19-2437] Scott Ahmad [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Heartware, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000653034] [19-2437] Scott Ahmad [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott M. Ahmad for Medtronic, Inc. and Heartware, Inc.. [1000653030] [19-2437] Scott Ahmad [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Matthew Saxon, Esq. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/10/2020. Response Brief due 03/09/2020 [19-2437] AW [Entered: 12/30/2019 10:37 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Stephanie Laconia, Kelly Winkler, Madeline Winkler and Tina W. Winkler. Transcript needed: N Transcript already on file: N Transcript order attached: N [19-2437] AW [Entered: 12/30/2019 10:34 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stephanie Laconia, Kelly Winkler, Madeline Winkler and Tina W. Winkler. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000652814] [19-2437] AW [Entered: 12/30/2019 10:32 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John J. Sellinger for Tina W. Winkler, Madeline Winkler, Kelly Winkler and Stephanie Laconia. [1000652789] [19-2437] John Sellinger [Entered: 12/30/2019 10:25 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00865-PX. Mailed to: DaWanna LaShawn McCray, Matthew Mulhanney Saxon, John James Sellinger Sr, Scott Ahmad.[19-2437] KH [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00865-PX. Case manager: KHancock. [19-2437] KH [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less