This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2021 at 06:10:13 (UTC).

Tina Bradford v. LACOE, et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Tina Bradford filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against LACOE,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56148

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES

WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL BOARD

YORK RISK SERVICES, INC.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION

CENTER FOR DISEASE CONTROL

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, (Healthcare Department)

Plaintiff / Appellant

TINA MARIE BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tina Marie Bradford

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Margret Goedecke Parke

Vibiana M. Andrade Esquire

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Tina Marie Bradford opening brief of 3 pages (Informal: No). Served on 12/21/2020. [11945101] (LA) [Entered: 12/24/2020 02:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Tina Marie Bradford motion for relief of monetary judgement. Deficiencies: None. [11923313] (JFF) [Entered: 12/10/2020 04:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Tina Marie Bradford motion for government assistance. Deficiencies: None. [11908183] (JFF) [Entered: 11/27/2020 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tina Marie Bradford opening brief due 12/28/2020. Appellees Center for Disease Control, Department of Health Services, Los Angeles County Office of Education, Los Angeles Department of Health and Human Services, Workers Compensation Appeal Board and York Risk Services, Inc. answering brief due 01/27/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11878365] (JBS) [Entered: 11/02/2020 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less