This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:11:29 (UTC).

Timothy Visage v. R. Woodall, et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Timothy Visage filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against R Woodall. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11017

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

C.O.I. JONES, individually and in his/her official capacity

C. FISHER, individually and in his/her official capacity

R. E. WOODALL, individually and in his/her official capacity

E. CREWS, individually and in his/her official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

TIMOTHY C. VISAGE

Raiford, FL 32083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Marcus Owen Graper

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Kristen Jennifer Lonergan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

400 S Monroe St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Damaris E. Reynolds

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

107 W Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6549

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy C. Visage

Attorney at Union CI - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1000

Raiford, FL 32083

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #50

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

USDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees Assessed. Filed on 03/29/2019. Docket Entry 63. [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristen Lonergan for All Appellees [19-11017] (ECF: Kristen Lonergan) [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:06 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/28/2019 filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8770070-1] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:44 PM]

Open Document

Notice of filing: "Certificate that no transcripts to order in this case" as to Appellant Timothy C. Visage. [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Timothy C. Visage. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. [Entered: 04/03/2019 09:04 AM]

Open Document #4

DC Order DE #56

Open Document #1

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:24 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/13/2019 filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8757455-1] [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:56 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristen Jennifer Lonergan for Appellees E. Crews, C. Fisher, C.O.I. Jones and R. E. Woodall. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11017] (ECF: Kristen Lonergan) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order DE #51

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8757455-2 ] Appellants brief due on 05/13/2019. [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document #5

PLRA-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage is GRANTED. [ # 8770070-2 ] Appellants brief due on 05/28/2019. ELB [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/28/2019 filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8770070-1] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8757455-2 ] Appellants brief due on 05/13/2019. [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/13/2019 filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8757455-1] [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristen Jennifer Lonergan for Appellees E. Crews, C. Fisher, C.O.I. Jones and R. E. Woodall. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11017] (ECF: Kristen Lonergan) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kristen Jennifer Lonergan for R. E. Woodall, C. Fisher, C.O.I. Jones and E. Crews. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: "Certificate that no transcripts to order in this case" as to Appellant Timothy C. Visage. [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristen Lonergan for All Appellees [19-11017] (ECF: Kristen Lonergan) [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Timothy C. Visage. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. [Entered: 04/03/2019 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage. [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees Assessed. Filed on 03/29/2019. Docket Entry 63. [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Timothy C. Visage on 03/18/2019. Fee Status: IFP Pending USDC motion Pending: Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis, DE #60 03/18/2019. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.