This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2019 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Timothy Turner v. Scott, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Timothy Turner filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1030

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MS. SCOTT

MR. GONZALEZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

TIMOTHY A. TURNER

Minersville, PA 17954

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel J. Gibbons Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Elizabeth A. Pascal Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

Camden Federal Building & Courthouse, 401 Market Street

Camden, NJ 08101

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy A. Turner

Attorney at Schuylkill FCI

P.O. Box 759

Minersville, PA 17954

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Timothy A. Turner for Appointment of Counsel, With Memorandum in Support and Declaration In Support. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2019. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:05 PM]

Open Document #2

Warden Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for attorney Appearance, attorney Appearance. Service made on 01/24/2019 by US mail. [19-1030] (EAP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:31 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Opinion dated 121918

Open Document #2

District Court Order dated 121918

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Timothy A. Turner for Appointment of Counsel, With Memorandum in Support and Declaration In Support. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2019. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Timothy A. Turner. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 02/01/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for attorney Appearance, attorney Appearance. Service made on 01/24/2019 by US mail. [19-1030] (EAP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Timothy A. Turner, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Timothy A. Turner, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Timothy A. Turner, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Timothy A. Turner to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (PDB) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Elizabeth A. Pascal, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) MS. SCOTT; MR. GONZALEZ. [19-1030] (EAP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Andrew Ruymann, Chief, Civil Division on behalf of Appellee(s) MS. SCOTT; MR. GONZALEZ. [19-1030] (JAR) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Timothy A. Turner in District Court No. 1-15-cv-05942. (PDB) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mr. Gonzalez is a litigant

Latest cases where MS. SCOTT is a litigant