This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:16:22 (UTC).

Timothy Olmos v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Timothy Olmos filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16804

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TIMOTHY PAUL OLMOS

Kingman, AZ 86402

Defendant / Appellees

CHARLES L. RYAN

RICHARD PRATT

MARK SHIPMAN

JEFFERY WRIGLEY, named as Jeff Wrigley

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

DR. FOSTER, First name unknown

CRYSTAL BITZ

GEO GROUP, INC.

LORI A. LINN

DAVID SHINN, Director

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy Paul Olmos

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX (KINGMAN)

P.O. Box 6639

Kingman, AZ 86402

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Ken Sanders

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL

416 W Congress

Tucson, AZ 85701

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12597195] (CKP) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:40 PM]

#3

(#3) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos notice re In Forma Pauperis Status. [12603665] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:28 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos letter dated 12/01/2022 re: party listing correction request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12603669] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:30 PM]

#5

(#5) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos request for copy of FRAP Rules. [12603671] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:31 PM]

#7

(#7) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 12/08/2022. [12609586] (NAC) [Entered: 12/13/2022 03:05 PM]

#8

(#8) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos request for copy of FRAP Rules. (copy mailed on 12/96/2022) [12609590] (NAC) [Entered: 12/13/2022 03:06 PM]

9 #1

Main Document

9 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

#10

(#10) Received copy of District Court document filed by Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos re: notice of errata. [12610228] (NAC) [Entered: 12/14/2022 10:59 AM]

#11

(#11) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 1/03/2023. [12623974] (HH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 02:46 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None [12632309] (NAC) [Entered: 01/18/2023 07:41 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None [12632309] (NAC) [Entered: 01/18/2023 07:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 1/03/2023. [12623974] (HH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Received copy of District Court document filed by Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos re: notice of errata. [12610228] (NAC) [Entered: 12/14/2022 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12609964] (CKP) [Entered: 12/14/2022 09:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos request for copy of FRAP Rules. (copy mailed on 12/96/2022) [12609590] (NAC) [Entered: 12/13/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 12/08/2022. [12609586] (NAC) [Entered: 12/13/2022 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Docket(#6) Sent Appellant a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to the letter of request received on 12/06/2022. [12603707] (JR) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos request for copy of FRAP Rules. [12603671] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos letter dated 12/01/2022 re: party listing correction request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12603669] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos notice re In Forma Pauperis Status. [12603665] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 02:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12597195] (CKP) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Timothy Paul Olmos opening brief due 01/20/2023. Appellees Crystal Bitz, Correct Care Solutions, Foster, Geo Group, Inc., Lori A. Linn, Richard Pratt, Charles L. Ryan, David Shinn, Director, Mark Shipman and Jeffery Wrigley answering brief due 02/21/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12594980] (JMR) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant