This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/19/2019 at 06:08:16 (UTC).

Timothy Elkins, Jr. v. Tony Guinn, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Timothy Elkins, Jr filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Tony Guinn,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1963

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TIMOTHY W. ELKINS, JR.

Sheridan, IL 60551-0000

Defendant / Appellees

TONY GUINN, Retired Correctional Officer

SARA JOHNSON, Lieutenant

M. MAYFIELD, Correctional Officer

MAJOR TRAYLOR, Correctional Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy W. Elkins Jr.

Attorney at SHERIDAN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

4017 E. 2603 Road

Sheridan, IL 60551-0000

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

5 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re: Motion to reconsider and/or vacate judgment, and to grant in forma pauperis status. [ # 12 ] The motion is DENIED. The appellant shall pay the required docketing fee by July 22, 2019, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7017 2680 0001 1550 1013. WLS [13] [7017098] [19-1963] (PS) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. to reconsider and/or vacate judgment, and to grant in forma pauperis status as I have identified a potentially merit argument for appeal. [12] [7015790] [19-1963] (ER) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re: 1) Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. [ # 6 ] 2) Memorandum in Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis and Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. Memorandum in Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. 3) Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. [ # 10 ] The motions to proceed in forma pauperis are DENIED. The appellant has not identified a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. The appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1333 7470. [11] [7013945] WLS [19-1963] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prose motion filed by Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [7011789] [19-1963] (CAG) [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [9] [7011787] [19-1963] (CAG) [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Before the court is a letter filed on June 4, 2019, by the pro se appellant. The court will treat the letter as the appellants PLRA memorandum. This appeal will now proceed to a determination of the appellant's fee status. To the extent that the appellant also seeks appointment of counsel in the letter, the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated May 20, 2019. [ # 7 ] [8] [7009566] CMD [19-1963] (CAG) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLRA memorandum filed by Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. with a request for recruitment of counsel. [7] [7009411] [19-1963] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prose motion filed by Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (Trust fund account statement included) [6] [7009410] [19-1963] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/29/2019. [5] [7007841] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/28/2019. [19-1963] (CM) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Before the court is the appellant's Notice of Settlement Offer, filed on May 28, 2019, in which he seeks to dismiss this appeal. Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) allows an appellant to voluntarily dismiss his appeal. Voluntary dismissal, however, does not relieve the appellant of the obligation to pay the appellate filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Because it appears that the appellant would like to be relieved of the obligation to pay the appellate fees, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. If the appellant would still like to dismiss this appeal, he should file an appropriate motion in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). [ # 3 ] [4] [7007615] CMD [19-1963] (AP) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Timothy W. Elkins, Jr. to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [3] [7007588] [19-1963] (CMD) [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7005877] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1963] (PS) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Timothy W. Elkins Jr. by 05/28/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 06/03/2019. [1] [7005871] [19-1963] (PS) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. Elkins Jr.