This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2020 at 06:39:05 (UTC).

Tilda Gaines v. MD Anderson Services Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Tilda Gaines filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against MD Anderson Services Corp . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-20070

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TILDA GAINES

Defendant / Appellees

MD ANDERSON SERVICES CORPORATION

UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

NAthan Eugene Inurria

Attorney at Guerra and Farah P.L.L.C.

1211 Hyde Park Boulevard

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Benjamin Storey Lyles

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Benjamin Storey Lyles for University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20070] (Benjamin Storey Lyles ) [Entered: 03/11/2020 12:28 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9258155-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/12/2020 for Appellant Tilda Gaines [20-20070] (JMW) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:03 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Tilda Gaines [20-20070] (ABT) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:08 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9273594-2] [20-20070] (ABT) [Entered: 03/18/2020 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Benjamin Storey Lyles for Appellee University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center in 20-20070 [20-20070] (CAG) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Benjamin Storey Lyles for University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20070] (Benjamin Storey Lyles ) [Entered: 03/11/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9258155-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/12/2020 for Appellant Tilda Gaines [20-20070] (JMW) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Tilda Gaines [20-20070] (ABT) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Storey Lyles