This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 06:10:30 (UTC).

TIG Insurance Company v. FKI Industries, et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 TIG Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FKI Industries. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5104

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS, INC.

FKI INDUSTRIES, INC., FKA Acco Babcock, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

TIG INSURANCE COMPANY, as successor-in-interest to International Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael J. Gibbens

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

321 South Boston Avenue, Suite 500, 500 Kennedy Building

Tulsa, OK 74103

Barry Ira Buchman

Attorney at Haynes and Boone

800 17Th Street Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Benjamin L. Mesches

Attorney at Haynes and Boone

2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Marcy Geoffrey Glenn Esq.

Attorney at Holland & Hart

555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Philip Raymond Richards

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 South Main Street, Suite 1200

Tulsa, OK 74103

Casper Johan Den Harder

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 South Main Street, Suite 1200

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10788373] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 01/15/2021 for TIG Insurance Company. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/24/2020 10:51 AM]

Open Document

[10786484] Entry of appearance filed by Barry Ira Buchman for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/17/2020 07:52 AM]

Open Document

[10785772] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/13/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/23/2020 for TIG Insurance Company. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:47 AM]

Open Document

[10784760] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Benjamin L. Mesches for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:59 PM]

Open Document

[10784738] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by TIG Insurance Company. Served on: 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] --[Edited 11/09/2020 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] PRR [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:34 PM]

Open Document

[10784685] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Marcy Geoffrey Glenn, Esq. for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:44 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10783139] Entry of appearance filed by Casper Johan Den Harder and Philip Raymond Richards for TIG Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:02 PM]

Open Document

[10783115] Docketing statement filed by TIG Insurance Company. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] PRR [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:45 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter and preliminary record

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10788373] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 01/15/2021 for TIG Insurance Company. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/24/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10786484] Entry of appearance filed by Barry Ira Buchman for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/17/2020 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket[10786474] Entry of appearance submitted by Barry Ira Buchman for Appellees FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 11/17/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 11/17/20][20-5104] BIB [Entered: 11/17/2020 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10785772] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/13/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/23/2020 for TIG Insurance Company. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10784760] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Benjamin L. Mesches for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket[10784752] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 11/16/2020 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-5104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10784738] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by TIG Insurance Company. Served on: 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] --[Edited 11/09/2020 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] PRR [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket[10784699] Entry of appearance submitted by Benjamin L. Mesches for Appellees Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc. and FKI Industries, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104]--[Edited 11/09/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 11/9/20.] BLM [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10784685] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Marcy Geoffrey Glenn, Esq. for FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket[10784656] Entry of appearance submitted by Marcy G. Glenn for Appellees FKI Industries, Inc. and Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 11/09/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 11/9/20][20-5104] MGG [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10783478] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-5104] [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10783139] Entry of appearance filed by Casper Johan Den Harder and Philip Raymond Richards for TIG Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5104] [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10783115] Docketing statement filed by TIG Insurance Company. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] PRR [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket[10783113] Entry of appearance submitted by Phil R. Richards; Casper J. den Harder for Appellant TIG Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5104] --[Edited 11/02/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 11/2/20] PRR [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10781270] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/26/2020 Docketing statement due 11/09/2020 for TIG Insurance Company. Transcript order form due 11/09/2020 for TIG Insurance Company. Notice of appearance due on 11/09/2020 for Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc., FKI Industries, Inc. and TIG Insurance Company. [20-5104] [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less