This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:05:16 (UTC).

Tiffany Ivy v. Amanda McDaniel

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Tiffany Ivy filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Amanda McDaniel. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1484

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent

Amanda McDaniel, Sergeant, Craighead County Detention Center

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tiffany C. Ivy

Newport, AR 72112-5555

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

JaNan A. Davis

Attorney at ASSOCIATION OF ARKANSAS COUNTIES

1415 W. Third Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tiffany C. Ivy

Attorney at MCPHERSON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

302 Corrections Drive

Newport, AR 72112-5555

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4764845] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:11 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by JaNan Arnold Davis for Respondent Ms. Amanda McDaniel w/service 03/11/2019 [4765167] [19-1484] (JAD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Tiffany C. Ivy due 05/02/2019. [4778913] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 04/18/2019 08:25 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/08/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4764841] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:05 AM]

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4764803] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:43 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 2/13/2019, and Docket Text Order dated 3/8/2019. [4764833] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:01 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Tiffany C. Ivy due 05/02/2019. [4778913] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 04/18/2019 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by JaNan Arnold Davis for Respondent Ms. Amanda McDaniel w/service 03/11/2019 [4765167] [19-1484] (JAD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4764845] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/08/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4764841] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 2/13/2019, and Docket Text Order dated 3/8/2019. [4764833] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4764803] [19-1484] (CMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.