This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/29/2022 at 06:06:36 (UTC).

thyssenkrupp Materials LLC v. Triumph Group Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 thyssenkrupp Materials LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Triumph Group Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1146

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

THYSSENKRUPP MATERIALS LLC

Defendant / Appellants

TRIUMPH GROUP INC.

TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark C. Vanneste

450 W. Fourth Street

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Thomas Walters

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl

900 Wilshire Drive, Suite 300

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Joel B. Bailey

Attorney at Hedrick Kring Bailey

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4650

Dallas, TX 75201

David McDaniel

277777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfiled, MI 48034-8214

Judith Greenstone Miller

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034

Kodie P. Bennion

Attorney at Hedrick Kring Bailey

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4650

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (MTW) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:58 AM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:17 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. by Joel B. Bailey. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 12:48 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. by Kodie P. Bennion. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 12:54 PM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee thyssenkrupp Materials LLC by Thomas H. Walters. Certificate of Service: 03/10/2022. [22-1146] (TW) [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:47 AM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joel B. Bailey for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:51 PM]

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Walters for Appellee thyssenkrupp Materials LLC Certificate of Service: 03/15/2022. [22-1146] (TW) [Entered: 03/15/2022 11:27 AM]

#14

(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joel B. Bailey for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc... Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:31 PM]

#15

(#15) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter, Counsel and Clients. . [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 03/23/2022 01:31 PM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/16/2022; appellee brief due 06/14/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 04/05/2022 08:39 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/16/2022; appellee brief due 06/14/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 04/05/2022 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket(#16) Transcript, [6], has been filed in the District Court on 04/04/2022 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Carol Marie Harrison ; Actual Number of Pages: 79 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [22-1146] (CMH) [Entered: 04/04/2022 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter, Counsel and Clients. . [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 03/23/2022 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joel B. Bailey for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc... Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Walters for Appellee thyssenkrupp Materials LLC Certificate of Service: 03/15/2022. [22-1146] (TW) [Entered: 03/15/2022 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joel B. Bailey for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee thyssenkrupp Materials LLC by Thomas H. Walters. Certificate of Service: 03/10/2022. [22-1146] (TW) [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee thyssenkrupp Materials LLC by Thomas H. Walters. Certificate of Service: 03/10/2022. [22-1146]--[Edited 03/10/2022 by MTW] (TW) [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [6] Transcript to be filed in district court by Carol Marie Harrison by 04/07/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 03/08/2022 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#8) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Carol Marie Harrison, for transcript [6] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 03/07/2022 ; Estimated completion date: 03/31/2022 ; Estimated number of pages: 75 . [22-1146] (CMH) [Entered: 03/08/2022 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [6]. Carol Marie Harrison's acknowledgement is due 03/22/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#6) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Carol Marie Harrison, filed by Mr. Joel B. Bailey for Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc.. [6] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 03/02/2022 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Matthew F. Leitman ; Hearing Dates: 11/16/2019 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Vacate AAA Arbitration Award and Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment Confirming AAA Arbitration Award ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. by Kodie P. Bennion. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc. by Joel B. Bailey. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1146] (JBB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Maria Welker. (MTW) [Entered: 02/28/2022 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Triumph Aerostructures LLC and Triumph Group Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (MTW) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Copper & Brass International Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIUMPH GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judith G. Miller