This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/26/2020 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

Throupe v. University of Denver, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Throupe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against University of Denver. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1069

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RONALD L. THROUPE

Defendant / Appellees

MARIE KLINE

PAUL OLK

UNIVERSITY OF DENVER

BARBARA JACKSON

GLENN MUELLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cassandra M. Kirsch

Attorney at Cassandra M. Kirsch Law Office

600 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2800-S

Denver, CO 80202

Nathaniel B. Smith

Attorney at Nathaniel B. Smith Law Office

225 Broadway, Suite 1901

New York, NY 10007

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jim Goh

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Erin R. Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Renee J. Sheyko

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10733058] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and Appendix until 06/04/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:10 PM]

Open Document

[10728141] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief until 05/05/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/05/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:31 AM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10725460] Entry of appearance filed by Nathaniel B Smith for Ronald L. Throupe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (One of the parties listed was previously disclosed and another party is counsel of record). Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:14 PM]

Open Document

[10725443] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ronald L. Throupe. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] NBS [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:55 PM]

Open Document

[10725441] Docketing statement filed by Ronald L. Throupe. Served on 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] NBS [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:54 PM]

Open Document

[10724763] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no docketing statement, transcript order form, or entry of appearance filed on behalf of Appellant. Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due on 03/16/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/12/2020 07:41 AM]

Open Document

[10724468] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jim Goh and Renee J. Sheyko for University of Denver, Barbara Jackson, Glenn Mueller, Marie Kline and Paul Olk. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1069] [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:50 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10733058] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and Appendix until 06/04/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10728141] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief until 05/05/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/05/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10728048] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 04/07/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-1069] [Entered: 03/25/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket[10725882] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/16/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 04/27/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket[10725498] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/20/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1069] [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725460] Entry of appearance filed by Nathaniel B Smith for Ronald L. Throupe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (One of the parties listed was previously disclosed and another party is counsel of record). Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725443] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ronald L. Throupe. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] NBS [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725441] Docketing statement filed by Ronald L. Throupe. Served on 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] NBS [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket[10725440] Entry of appearance submitted by Nathaniel B. Smith for Appellant Ronald L. Throupe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] --[Edited 03/13/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 3/13/2020.] NBS [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket[10725100] Deficient entry of appearance, docketing statement, and transcript order form filed. Type of deficiency: the documents filed were scanned (all documents filed in this court must be searchable); documents must be individually filed with the appropriate docket event (all documents were attached to the entry of appearance entry). These documents will be removed from the docket. Counsel is directed to correct the deficiency and re-file the documents. Docketing statement, notice of appearance, and transcript order due 03/16/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket - counsel is directed to re-file the documents per the 3/12/20 deficiency notice. [LAB] [10725065] Entry of appearance submitted by Nathaniel B. Smith for Appellant Ronald L. Throupe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] NBS [Entered: 03/12/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10724763] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no docketing statement, transcript order form, or entry of appearance filed on behalf of Appellant. Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due on 03/16/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. [20-1069] [Entered: 03/12/2020 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10724468] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jim Goh and Renee J. Sheyko for University of Denver, Barbara Jackson, Glenn Mueller, Marie Kline and Paul Olk. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1069] [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket[10724465] Entry of appearance submitted by Jim Goh and Renee Sheyko for Appellees University of Denver, Paul Olk, Marie Kline, Glenn Mueller and Barbara Jackson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1069] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 03/11/2020 by NA] JG [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10720718] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/26/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 03/11/2020 for Ronald L. Throupe. Notice of appearance due on 03/11/2020 for Barbara Jackson, Marie Kline, Glenn Mueller, Paul Olk and University of Denver. [20-1069] [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Denver is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin R. Mangum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jim Goh