This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/25/2021 at 06:01:25 (UTC).

Thomas Ostrowski v. Lake County, Indiana, et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Thomas Ostrowski filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lake County, Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2580

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

THOMAS OSTROWSKI

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant / Appellees

LAKE COUNTY, INDIANA

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF, in his official capacity

LAKE COUNTY TREASURER, in her capacity as Trustee of the Pension Plan of the Lake County Sheriff

PENSION COMMITTEE, of the Pension Plan of the Lake County Sheriff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas Ostrowski

4010 Rollingwood Court

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jaclyn S. Gessner

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG LLP

11 S. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3535

Bart Andrew Karwath

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG LLP

11 S. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3535

Kenneth J. Yerkes

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG LLP

11 S. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3535

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#15

#6

5 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

5 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Filed Response in Opposition by Appellant Thomas Ostrowski to to appellees' response in opposition to appellants' motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [27][7191358] [21-2580] (LCP) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER re: Motion to Strike Appearance & Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant/Appellees Should be Granted, CONSTRUED as a motion to reconsider this court's 10/04/2021 order. [ # 24 ] The motion is DENIED. NER [26] [7191042] [21-2580] (MM) [Entered: 10/08/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER re: Appellant's motion for a ruling on a preliminary questions. A review of the courts docket indicates that the appellants motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before this court and no briefs are due at this time. To the extent that appellant seeks to present evidence, the appellant may make any arguments he believes have merit in his opening brief, should this appeal proceed to briefing. CMD [25] [7190797] [21-2580] (AG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Thomas Ostrowski to strike appearance & Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant/Appellees should be granted. [24] [7190635] [21-2580]--[Edited 10/08/2021 by MM--CONSTRUED as a motion to reconsider this court's 10/04/2021 order.] (CM) [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Thomas Ostrowski for a ruling on a preliminary question(s). [23] [7190377] [21-2580] (LCP) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Filed Response in Opposition by Appellees Lake County Sheriff, Lake County Treasurer, Lake County, Indiana and Pension Committee in 21-2580, 21-1674 to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [22][7189773] [21-2580, 21-1674] (Gessner, Jaclyn) [Entered: 10/04/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re: 1. Motion to Strike Appearance & Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant/Appellees. Appellees' Response to Appellant's Motion to Strike Apperance and Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statements of Appellees. In light of the amended disclosure statements filed on 10/01/2021, appellant Thomas Ostrowskis motion is DENIED as unnecessary. NER [ # 15 ] [21] [7189541] [21-2580] (MM) [Entered: 10/04/2021 07:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth J. Yerkes for Appellees Lake County Sheriff, Lake County Treasurer, Lake County, Indiana and Pension Committee in 21-1674, 21-2580. [20] [7189445] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1674, 21-2580] (Yerkes, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/01/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bart A. Karwath for Appellees Lake County Sheriff, Lake County Treasurer, Lake County, Indiana and Pension Committee in 21-1674, 21-2580. [19] [7189439] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1674, 21-2580] (Karwath, Bart) [Entered: 10/01/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jaclyn S. Gessner for Appellees Lake County, Indiana, Pension Committee, Lake County Sheriff and Lake County Treasurer in 21-1674, 21-2580. [18] [7189433] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1674, 21-2580] (Gessner, Jaclyn) [Entered: 10/01/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jaclyn S. Gessner for Appellees Lake County Sheriff, Lake County Treasurer and Lake County, Indiana in 21-2580, 21-1674. for Lake County Treasurer in her capacity as Trustee of the Pension Plan of the Lake County Sheriff, and the Pension Committee of the Pension Plan. [10] [7186438] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2580, 21-1674] (Gessner, Jaclyn) [Entered: 09/17/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Appellees shall provide a complete docketing statement no later than September 17, 2021. (See order for further details) DW [9] [7185319] [21-2580] (AG) [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Lake County Sheriff, Lake County Treasurer, Lake County, Indiana and Pension Committee. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 21-1674 [8] [7184667] [21-2580] (Gessner, Jaclyn) [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellant's fee status on appeal. The briefing schedule in the appeal remains SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7184326] [21-2580] (FP) [Entered: 09/08/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Thomas Ostrowski. [6] [7184278] [21-2580] (CAH) [Entered: 09/08/2021 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Thomas Ostrowski leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 09/08/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/08/2021 for Appellant Thomas Ostrowski [7184214] [5] [7184214] [21-2580] (AP) [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Thomas Ostrowski to proceed. [4] [7184030] [21-2580] (CAH) [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Party Thomas Ostrowski. [3] [7182962] [21-2580] (CAH) [Entered: 09/01/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: This new appeal, filed pro se by plaintiff-appellant Thomas Ostrowski, appeals the award of costs and attorneys fees to defendants. The court notes, however, that plaintiff-appellant Thomas Ostrowski is represented by counsel as to the merits appeal docketed as Appeal No. 21-1674. Accordingly, appellant Thomas Ostrowski shall file a statement advising the court whether he intends to proceed pro se as to this appeal. Statement due for Appellant Thomas Ostrowski by 09/07/2021. DW [2] [7182680] [21-2580] (CMD) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 09/09/2021. [1] [7181887] [21-2580] (HTP) [Entered: 08/27/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lake County, Indiana is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth J. Yerkes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaclyn S. Gessner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart A. Karwath