This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/21/2022 at 06:17:11 (UTC).

Thomas Metyk, et al v. KeyCorp, et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2013 Thomas Metyk filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against KeyCorp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-3588

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HENRY L. MEYER, III

THOMAS W. BUNN

ROBERT L. MORRIS

JEFFREY B. WEEDEN

THOMAS C. STEVENS

THOMAS E. HELFRICH

KATHLEEN EGAN

KEYCORP TRUST OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE

KEYCORP

Plaintiff / Appellants

THOMAS J. METYK, on behalf of themselves and a class of persons similarly situated

ANTHONY S. LOBASSO, on behalf of themselves and a class of persons similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James A. Slater Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

David A. Carney

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Scott C. Holbrook

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Gretchen Lee Lange

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Daniel R. Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Samuel Kenneth Rosen

Attorney at Harwood Feffer

488 Madison Avenue, Eighth Floor

New York, NY 10022

Stephen J. Fearon Jr.

Attorney at Squitieri & Fearon

32 E. 57Th Street, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Michael Jason Klein

Attorney at Stull, Stull & Brody

Six E. 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#70

#69

#68

67 #2

Cover Letter

67 #1

judge order filed

#66

65 #2

signed opinion filed

65 #1

Cover Letter

#54

#11

#9

8 #2

corporate disclosure statement (Mr. Metyk)

8 #1

corporate disclosure statement (Mr. Lobasso)

#7

#6

#4

#3

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) U.S. Supreme Court letter filed denying the petition for a writ of certiorari [ # 69 ] filed by Thomas J. Metyk. Supreme Court Case No: 14-240, 11/17/2014.. (CL) [Entered: 11/18/2014 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) U.S. Supreme Court notice filed regarding a petition for a writ of certiorari filed by Appellant Thomas J. Metyk. Supreme Court Case No:14-240, 08/27/2014. (CL) [Entered: 09/08/2014 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (JRH) [Entered: 05/06/2014 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 66 ] filed by Mr. Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Eugene E. Siler , Jr., and Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 04/28/2014 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. for Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk. Certificate of Service: 04/09/2014. (SJF) [Entered: 04/09/2014 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) OPINION filed : The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Decision not for publication. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Eugene E. Siler, Jr., and Raymond M. Kethledge (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges. (CL) [Entered: 03/26/2014 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Docket(#64) CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk and Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Appellees KeyCorp, Thomas C. Stevens, KeyCorp Trust Oversight Committee, Jeffrey B. Weeden, Thomas W. Bunn, Thomas E. Helfrich, Robert L. Morris and Henry L. Meyer, III before Suhrheinrich,Circuit Judge; Siler,Circuit Judge and Kethledge,Circuit Judge. (KSC) [Entered: 01/22/2014 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE filed regarding an additional citation, [ # 54 ]. Response from Attorney Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Appellees KeyCorp, Thomas C. Stevens, KeyCorp Trust Oversight Committee, Jeffrey B. Weeden, Thomas W. Bunn, Thomas E. Helfrich, Robert L. Morris and Henry L. Meyer, III. Certificate of Service:12/18/2013. (DRW) [Entered: 12/18/2013 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Appellees KeyCorp, Thomas C. Stevens, KeyCorp Trust Oversight Committee, Jeffrey B. Weeden, Thomas W. Bunn, Thomas E. Helfrich, Robert L. Morris and Henry L. Meyer, III. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2013. (DRW) [Entered: 12/17/2013 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2013. (SJF) [Entered: 12/16/2013 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk by Samuel K. Rosen. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2013. (SKR) [Entered: 05/28/2013 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Jason Klein for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk Certificate of Service: 05/21/2013. (MJK) [Entered: 05/21/2013 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Michael Jason Klein for Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk; Transcript not needed. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2013. (MJK) [Entered: 05/21/2013 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Jason Klein for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk Certificate of Service: 05/21/2013. (FORMS MUST BE FILED SEPARATELY OR JOINTLY) (MJK) [Entered: 05/21/2013 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Jason Klein for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk. Certificate of Service:05/21/2013. (MJK) [Entered: 05/21/2013 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk by Michael J. Klein. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2013. (MJK) [Entered: 05/21/2013 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk by Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2013. (SJF) [Entered: 05/21/2013 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/25/2013; appellee brief due 07/29/2013. (JRH) [Entered: 05/13/2013 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jeanine Hance (JRH) [Entered: 05/13/2013 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Anthony S. Lobasso and Thomas J. Metyk. Transcript needed: n. (JRH) [Entered: 05/13/2013 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KeyCorp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Jason Klein