This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:49 (UTC).

Thomas Heyer v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Thomas Heyer filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against U S Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7027

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT PAUL BOYD

Defendant / Appellees

WARDEN SARA M. REVELL

THOMAS R. KANE, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the United States Bureau of Prisons

IKE EICHENLAUB, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the United States Bureau of Prisons Mid-Atlantic Region

WARDEN TRACY W. JOHNS

WILLIAM P. BARR

UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

THOMAS HEYER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Dee Dannels

Attorney at FMC BUTNER

P. O. Box 1600

Butner, NC 27509-0000

Christina Ann Kelley

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Robert J. Dodson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

310 New Bern Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27601-1461

Michael Bredenberg

Attorney at BUREAU OF PRISONS

Legal Department, Old Highway 75, P. O. Box 1600

Butner, NC 27509-0000

G. Norman Acker III

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

310 New Bern Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27601-1461

Joshua Bryan Royster

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ian S. Hoffman

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew Tutt

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER filed [1000578617] granting motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 09/30/2019. Response brief due 10/28/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:13 AM]

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Consent/stipulation

#10

(#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/09/2019. Response Brief due 10/07/2019 [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:18 PM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Thomas Heyer. [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:58 AM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Thomas Heyer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000555581] [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:51 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua B. Royster, Assistant U.S. Attorney for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000554216] [19-7027] Joshua Royster [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:06 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christina A. Kelley for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000547775] [19-7027] Christina Kelley [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:27 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael Bredenberg for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000547769] [19-7027] Michael Bredenberg [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:23 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ian S. Hoffman for Thomas Heyer. [1000547365] [19-7027] Ian Hoffman [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:22 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew T. Tutt for Thomas Heyer. [1000547073] [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:59 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:11-ct-03118-D.. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:14 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:11-ct-03118-D. Case manager: MRadday. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:04 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER filed [1000578617] granting motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 09/30/2019. Response brief due 10/28/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT/STIPULATION by Thomas Heyer to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 30, 2019. [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/30/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/09/2019. Response Brief due 10/07/2019 [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Thomas Heyer. [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Thomas Heyer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000555581] [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua B. Royster, Assistant U.S. Attorney for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000554216] [19-7027] Joshua Royster [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christina A. Kelley for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000547775] [19-7027] Christina Kelley [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael Bredenberg for William P. Barr, Ike Eichenlaub, Tracy W. Johns, Thomas R. Kane, Sara M. Revell and United States Bureau of Prisons. [1000547769] [19-7027] Michael Bredenberg [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ian S. Hoffman for Thomas Heyer. [1000547365] [19-7027] Ian Hoffman [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew T. Tutt for Thomas Heyer. [1000547073] [19-7027] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:11-ct-03118-D.. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:11-ct-03118-D. Case manager: MRadday. [19-7027] MR [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less