This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 06:07:25 (UTC).

Thomas Heinen, et al v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Thomas Heinen filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-13750

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ALEJANDRO HERNANDEZ

JACOB KUNZ

PENNY BUCKNER

ANGELINA KUNZ

CLAYTON MCDONALD

MARIAH JOHNSON

BETTY JOHNSON

MIRANDA DELANEY

JOSH RUSSELL

JOANN RUIZ

EDNA NICKERSON

SAVANNA VALDEZ

GRACE KUNZ

THOMAS HEINEN

TAYLOR JOHNSON

MICHAEL JOHNSON

RYAN ENG

BRANDEN DELANEY

DAVID KUNZ

Defendant / Appellee

ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jason Robert Margulies

Attorney at Law Office of Jason Margulies

7745 Sw 139 Terr

Pine Crest, FL 33158

Marc E. Weiner

Attorney at Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA

One Biscayne Tower Ste 1776, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Michael A. Winkleman

Attorney at Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA

One Biscayne Tower Ste 1776, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Daniel Wayne Grammes

Attorney at Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA

One Biscayne Tower Ste 1776, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Scott Daniel Ponce

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Sanford L. Bohrer

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel W. Grammes for Appellant [19-13750] (ECF: Daniel Grammes) [Entered: 11/08/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:59 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc E. Weiner for Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Marc Weiner) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:48 AM]

Open Document

ORDER: The appellants' motion for leave to file the civil appeal statement out of time is GRANTED. (AGW) [ # 8904665-2 ] [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Winkleman for Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

The motion to file civil appeal statement out of time filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants has been conditionally filed. It will be returned unfiled if an appearance of counsel form has not been filed by counsel within 14 days. [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:20 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to file Civil Appeal Statement form out of time filed by Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. Motion is Unopposed. [8904665-1] [19-13750]--[Edited 10/11/2019 by JC] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:18 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Michael Johnson, Betty Johnson, Thomas Heinen, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Edna Nickerson, Grace Kunz, Miranda Delaney, Branden Delaney, Penny Buckner, Ryan Eng, JoAnn Ruiz, Alejandro Hernandez, Savanna Valdez, Clayton McDonald, Josh Russell, Taylor Johnson and Mariah Johnson has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 10/10/2019 08:45 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. No hearings. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford L. Bohrer for Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. [19-13750] (ECF: Sanford Bohrer) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:47 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 09/20/2019 as to Appellant Penny Buckner. [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:33 PM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel W. Grammes for Appellant [19-13750] (ECF: Daniel Grammes) [Entered: 11/08/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc E. Weiner for Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Marc Weiner) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The appellants' motion for leave to file the civil appeal statement out of time is GRANTED. (AGW) [ # 8904665-2 ] [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Winkleman for Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The motion to file civil appeal statement out of time filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants has been conditionally filed. It will be returned unfiled if an appearance of counsel form has not been filed by counsel within 14 days. [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to file Civil Appeal Statement form out of time filed by Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. Motion is Unopposed. [8904665-1] [19-13750]--[Edited 10/11/2019 by JC] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Michael Johnson, Betty Johnson, Thomas Heinen, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Edna Nickerson, Grace Kunz, Miranda Delaney, Branden Delaney, Penny Buckner, Ryan Eng, JoAnn Ruiz, Alejandro Hernandez, Savanna Valdez, Clayton McDonald, Josh Russell, Taylor Johnson and Mariah Johnson has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 10/10/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. No hearings. [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Winkleman for Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, David Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13750] (ECF: Michael Winkleman) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [19-13750] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford L. Bohrer for Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. [19-13750] (ECF: Sanford Bohrer) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 09/20/2019 as to Appellant Penny Buckner. [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Penny Buckner, Branden Delaney, Miranda Delaney, Ryan Eng, Thomas Heinen, Alejandro Hernandez, Betty Johnson, Mariah Johnson, Michael Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Angelina Kunz, Grace Kunz, Jacob Kunz, Clayton McDonald, Edna Nickerson, JoAnn Ruiz, Josh Russell and Savanna Valdez on 09/20/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/30/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/04/2019 as to Appellant Penny Buckner. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/18/2019 as to Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Daniel Ponce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sanford L. Bohrer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Wayne Grammes