This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:06:10 (UTC).

Thomas Brown v. Lioneld Jordan, et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Thomas Brown filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lioneld Jordan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1518

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Flash Market Owners, names unknown at present

Scott A. Lyons, Flash Market, name revised from Michael Scott Lyons, Flash Mart

Tim Helder, Sheriff, Washington County, in his official capacity

R. Schleiff, in his official and personal capacity

Jail Staff John and Jane Does, in their official and personal capacity

Jane Doe, Assistant City Attorney, in her official and personal capacity

William Storey, in his official and personal capacity

City Police Officer Craig Stout, in his official and personal capacity

City Police Officer B. Kuchenbecker, in his official and personal capacity

City Attorney Kit Williams, in his official and personal capacity

Chuck Rutherford, City Building Department Employee, in his official and personal capacity

Mayor Lioneld Jordan, in his official and personal capacity, name revised from Mayor Lionel Jorden

Plaintiff / Appellant

Thomas F. Brown

Fayetteville, AR 72702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

JaNan A. Davis

Attorney at ASSOCIATION OF ARKANSAS COUNTIES

1415 W. Third Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Brian D. Wood

Attorney at ROY & LAMBERT

2706 S. Dividend Drive, P.O. Box 7030

Springdale, AR 72766-7030

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas F. Brown

P.O. Box 2827

Fayetteville, AR 72702

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brian D. Wood for Appellees Kit Williams, Craig Stout, William Storey, R. Schleiff, Chuck Rutherford, B. Kuchenbecker and Lioneld Jordan w/service 04/07/2019 [4774785] [19-1518] (BDW) [Entered: 04/07/2019 01:37 PM]

Open Document #1

motion for extension of time to file opening brief

Open Document #1

Civil Docketing Letter

Open Restricted Document #2

envelope

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by JaNan Arnold Davis for Appellee Tim Helder w/service 03/15/2019 [4767068] [19-1518] (JAD) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:26 AM]

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum Opinion and Order 2/14/19, Order 3/6/19, docket entries, [4766353] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:43 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Denying as moot [ # 4778017-2 ] motion for ext of time to file opening brief, filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas F. Brown. A briefing schedule has not been issued in this matter. [4778020] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:20 AM]

Open Document #2

envelope

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/10/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766355] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:43 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion to proceed on appeal IFP

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED - Case dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. BOBBY E. SHEPHERD, PASCO M. BOWMAN and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Apr 2019 [4778809] [19-1518] (CMD) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Denying as moot [ # 4778017-2 ] motion for ext of time to file opening brief, filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas F. Brown. A briefing schedule has not been issued in this matter. [4778020] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file Opening Brief until 05/09/2019[4778017], filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas F. Brown w/service 04/09/2019. [4778017] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas F. Brown w/service 04/08/2019. [4775182] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Brian D. Wood for Appellees Kit Williams, Craig Stout, William Storey, R. Schleiff, Chuck Rutherford, B. Kuchenbecker and Lioneld Jordan w/service 04/07/2019 [4774785] [19-1518] (BDW) [Entered: 04/07/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by JaNan Arnold Davis for Appellee Tim Helder w/service 03/15/2019 [4767068] [19-1518] (JAD) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/10/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766355] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum Opinion and Order 2/14/19, Order 3/6/19, docket entries, [4766353] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4766340] [19-1518] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.