This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:42 (UTC).

Thomas Atencio, et al v. Tunecore, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Thomas Atencio filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tunecore, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55814

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TUNECORE, INC., a corporation

Plaintiff / Appellants

THOMAS ATENCIO, an adult individual

GIAN CATERINE, an adult individual, also known as John Cate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jessica J. Mead Esquire

Attorney at Collins, Collins, Muir & Stewart, LLP

1100 El Centro Street

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Eric Amdursky

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

2765 Sand Hill Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025-7019

Ryan Rutledge

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kelly Wood

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason Archinaco

Attorney at Archinaco/Bracken

The Pennsylvanian, Suite C6, 1100 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#2

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tunecore, Inc. in 19-55901 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/09/2019. [11392968] [19-55901, 19-55814] (Mead, Jessica) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:53 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Thomas Atencio and Gian Caterine Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371552] [19-55814] (Archinaco, Jason) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:24 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Tunecore, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372372] [19-55814] (Mead, Jessica) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:12 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/12/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11381934] (BLS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:06 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • (#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11393270][19-55814] (AD) [Entered: 08/09/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tunecore, Inc. in 19-55901 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/09/2019. [11392968] [19-55901, 19-55814] (Mead, Jessica) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/09/2019. First cross appeal brief due 10/24/2019 for Thomas Atencio and Gian Caterine. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/25/2019 for Tunecore, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/26/2019 for Thomas Atencio and Gian Caterine. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Tunecore, Inc. is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11385772] [19-55901, 19-55814] (RT) [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/12/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11381934] (BLS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Tunecore, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372372] [19-55814] (Mead, Jessica) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11371581][19-55814] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Thomas Atencio and Gian Caterine Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371552] [19-55814] (Archinaco, Jason) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/15/2019. Transcript due 09/16/2019. Appellants Thomas Atencio and Gian Caterine opening brief due 10/24/2019. Appellee Tunecore, Inc. answering brief due 11/25/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11365450] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.