This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/18/2021 at 06:19:19 (UTC).

Theron Vinson v. Covil Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Theron Vinson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Covil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1297

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

COVIL CORPORATION

ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, a wholly owned subsidiary of Emerson Electric Company

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., f/k/a Square D Company

EATON ELECTRICAL, INC., f/k/a Cutler-Hammer, Incorporated

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation

VELAN VALVE CORP.

GRINNELL LLC, d/b/a Grinnell Corporation

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Hookers Chemical Corporation

GOULD ELECTRONICS INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE Circuit Breaker Company

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, individually and as a successor-in-interest to Anchor/Darling Valve Company

Plaintiff / Appellant

THERON T. VINSON, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Kerry D. Vinson

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scottie Forbes Lee

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

P. O. Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue, P. O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636-0000

Curtis James Shipley

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

P. O. Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

William Michael Starr

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Tracy Edward Tomlin

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Scott Edward Frick

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Moffatt Grier McDonald

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

William David Conner

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Christopher Barton Major Esq.

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Marc Graham

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

Lisa White Shirley

Attorney at DEAN OMAR BRANHAM SHIRLEY, LLP

302 North Market Street

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

#20

#19

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/16/2021. Response Brief due 07/16/2021 [21-1297] AW [Entered: 05/07/2021 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER filed denying Motion to consolidate case. [ # 20 ] Copies to all parties. [1000947849] [21-1297] AW [Entered: 05/07/2021 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Covil Corporation to Motion to consolidate case [ # 20 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER filed suspending briefing pending resolution of motion to consolidate; administratively terminating Motion to extend filing time [ # 23 ], administratively terminating Motion to extend filing time [ # 22 ] Copies to all parties. [1000940923] [21-1297] DL [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Amended MOTION by Linda G. Vinson and Theron T. Vinson to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 28, 2021.. Date and method of service: 04/26/2021 ecf. [1000940658] [21-1297] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Linda G. Vinson and Theron T. Vinson to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 28, 2021.. Date and method of service: 04/26/2021 ecf. [1000940644] [21-1297]--[Edited 04/27/2021 by DL - See Amended Motion @ ECF 23] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE ISSUED to Covil Corporation in 21-1297, 21-1298 requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 20 ], Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000940497-2 ]Response due 05/06/2021.[1000940517]. [21-1297, 21-1298] TF [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION by Linda G. Vinson and Theron T. Vinson to consolidate case 21-1298 with 21-1297. Date and method of service: 04/26/2021 ecf. [1000940495] [21-1297] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss [ # 18 ] CBS Corporation as a party in 21-1297. Copies to all parties. [1000939004] [21-1297] AW [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/STIPULATION by CBS Corporation to dismiss party [21-1297] Jennifer Techman [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa W. Shirley for Linda G. Vinson and Theron T. Vinson. [1000928098] [21-1297] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 04/02/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Curtis J. Shipley for Covil Corporation. [1000926661] [21-1297] Curtis Shipley [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scottie Forbes Lee for Covil Corporation. [1000926659] [21-1297] Scottie Lee [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000926653] [21-1297] Leslie Packer [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leslie C. Packer for Covil Corporation. [1000926651] [21-1297] Leslie Packer [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Document(s) re-sent to CBS Corporation and Covil Corporation. Which document(s)?. Re: [ # 3 ] briefing order , [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2021. Response Brief due 05/28/2021. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00313-LCB-JEP. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00313-LCB-JEP. Case manager: AWalker. [21-1297] AW [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant