21-1303
02/18/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Trademark
THEIA HOLDINGS A INC, A Delaware Corporation
THEIA GROUP INC., A Delaware Corporation
THEIA TECHNOLOGIES LLC, An Oregon Domestic Limited Liability Company
Aaron D. Rauh Esq.
James Hickey Esq.
Jennifer L. Taylor Esq.
Mark L. Whitaker Esq.
Sabrina A. Larson Esq.
Nicole K. McLauglin Esq.
Tyler Marandola Esq.
Lena H. Hughes Esq.
Brian R. Matsui Esq.
Delfina S. Homen Esq.
Diane S. Danoff Esq.
Hillary A. Brooks Esq.
Luke Reilly Esq.
Briefing and Scheduling Order
Standing Order
Case Opening Letter
Caption
Memorandum
Order
Order
Notice of Appeal
Docket(#30) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc due on or before 05/10/2021. Appendix due on or before 05/10/2021. (SLC) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:05 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Theia Technologies LLC to motion for stay, Response. Certificate of Service dated 03/24/2021. [21-1303] (DSH) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:42 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) ECF FILER: REDACTED ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to MOTION on behalf of Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc containing Non-Confidential Version of Sealed Addendum to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 03/24/2021 by ECF. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:20 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc to stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal (Non-Confidential Version). Certificate of Service dated 03/24/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:15 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motions to seal by Appellants and Appellee are referred to the same panel of this Court that will consider the motion for stay pending appeal. As the motion and response do not need to be sealed in their entirety, the parties are directed to publicly file redacted versions within 7 days of the date of this order. The unredacted versions of the motion, the addendum, and the response will be held provisionally under seal pending disposition of the motion by the panel. (SLC) [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:21 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) dismissing the motion for extension of time filed by Appellee Theia Technologies LLC as moot. (KAG) [Entered: 03/17/2021 01:17 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc to Response. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2021. Service made by ECF [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:08 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Theia Technologies LLC to seal Portions of Technologies' Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2021. Service made by ECF, Email. [21-1303] (DSH) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:34 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to RESPONSE on behalf of Appellee Theia Technologies LLC. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2021 by ECF, Email. [21-1303] (DSH) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:32 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ECF FILER: SEALED Response filed by Appellee Theia Technologies LLC to motion for stay. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2021. Service made by ECF, Email. [21-1303] (DSH) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:29 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc to seal Portions of Sealed Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and Sealed Addendum to Sealed Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:29 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to MOTION on behalf of Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc containing Sealed Addendum to Sealed Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2021 by ECF. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:24 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to MOTION on behalf of Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc containing Addendum to Sealed Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2021 by ECF. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:18 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ECF FILER: SEALED Motion filed by Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc to stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2021. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:13 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:22 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lena H. Hughes on behalf of Appellant(s) Theia Group, Incorporated, Theia Holdings A, Inc.. [21-1303] (LHH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:19 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian R. Matsui on behalf of Appellant(s) Theia Group, Incorporated, Theia Holdings A, Inc.. [21-1303] (BRM) [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:15 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 02/18/2021. (SLC) [Entered: 02/18/2021 02:21 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:18 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Theia Group Inc. and Theia Holdings A Inc in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00097. (SLC) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:16 AM]
[-] Read Less