This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2019 at 06:09:25 (UTC).

THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC v. City of Dana Point

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City of Dana Point. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1107

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC

Debtor

In re: THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC

Appellee

CITY OF DANA POINT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Robert P. Goe Esquire

Attorney at GOE & FORSYTHE, LLP

18101 Von Karman Avenue

Irvine, CA 92612

Appellee Attorneys

Roger F. Friedman

Attorney at RUTAN & TUCKER, LLP

611 Anton Boulevard

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Jennifer Farrell

Attorney at RUTAN & TUCKER, LLP

611 Anton Boulevard

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

A. Patrick Munoz

Attorney at RUTAN & TUCKER, LLP

611 Anton Boulevard

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Certificate of readiness docketed. (CLS) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:11 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER (Taylor and Kurtz); allowing joint briefing; suspending briefing schedules. By TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 24, 2019, appellant must file a status report on the progress of the state court proceeding, or a voluntary motion to dismiss these appeals, if appropriate. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (CLS) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:16 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's motion to stay further action pending appeal; 05/14/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Moldo; Attorney for Appellant: Goe; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Farrell, Friedman, Munoz. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:34 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's certification of service (); served on 05/03/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Munoz; Attorney for Appellant: Goe. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:41 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's motion request to consolidate case with 19-1106 19-1107; 05/03/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Farrell, Friedman, Moldo, Munoz; Attorney for Appellant: Goe. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:49 AM]

2 #6

Corporate Parent Disclosure

2 #5

E-Filing Administrative Order

2 #4

BAP Rules

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

#2

Briefing Order

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

1 #2

Notice of Referral

#1

Notice of Appeal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of readiness docketed. (CLS) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER (Taylor and Kurtz); allowing joint briefing; suspending briefing schedules. By TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 24, 2019, appellant must file a status report on the progress of the state court proceeding, or a voluntary motion to dismiss these appeals, if appropriate. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (CLS) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's motion to stay further action pending appeal; 05/14/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Moldo; Attorney for Appellant: Goe; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Farrell, Friedman, Munoz. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's certification of service (); served on 05/03/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Munoz; Attorney for Appellant: Goe. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Attorney Robert P. Goe, Esquire for Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC in 19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107's motion request to consolidate case with 19-1106 19-1107; 05/03/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Blumenfeld, Farrell, Friedman, Moldo, Munoz; Attorney for Appellant: Goe. [19-1105, 19-1106, 19-1107] (RPG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant THE SUNSHINE GROUP, LLC's opening brief due 06/17/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 04/30/2019 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less