This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/15/2021 at 06:31:28 (UTC).

The Satanic Temple v. City of Belle Plaine, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 The Satanic Temple filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Belle Plaine,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3079

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

The Satanic Temple

Defendant / Appellees

City of Belle Plaine, Minnesota

Councilman Cary Coop, as City Council Member of the City of Belle Plaine, MN

Councilwoman Theresa McDaniel, as City Council Member of the City of Belle Plaine, MN

Councilman Ben Stier, as City Council Member of the City of Belle Plaine, MN

Councilman Paul Chard, as City Council Member of the City of Belle Plaine, MN

Mayor Christopher Meyer, as Mayor of the City of Belle Plaine, MN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason Scott Juran

Attorney at ROBERT R. HOPPER & ASSOCIATES

Suite 2450, 333 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew A. Kezhaya

Attorney at KEZHAYA LAW PLC

1202 N.E. Mcclain Road

Bentonville, AR 72712

Peter James Nickitas

Attorney at PETER J. NICKITAS LAW OFFICE, LLC

431 S. Seventh Street, Suite 2446, P.O. Box 15221

Minneapolis, MN 55145-0221

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Samuel Joseph Clark

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Davida Sheri McGhee

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Monte Mills

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Katherine M. Swenson

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/27/2021 [5081203] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 09/27/2021 05:39 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 - w/service 09/29/2021. [5082064] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:46 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record, Certificate of Transcript, and Method of Appendix Preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082065] [21-3079, 21-3081]--[Edited 09/30/2021 by CRJ. ENTRY EDITED TO ADD ADDITIONAL NOTICES.] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:48 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record, Certificate of Transcript, and Method of Appendix Preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082066] [21-3079, 21-3081]--[Edited 09/30/2021 by CRJ. ENTRY IS SAME AS 5082065 WITH THE EXCEPTION OF A FOOTER CHANGE FROM STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO DESIGNATION OF RECORD.] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:51 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/06/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew A. Kezhaya for Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 w/service 10/14/2021. [5087411] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 10/14/2021 05:29 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5087411-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Matthew A. Kezhaya. Brief of The Satanic Temple due 12/06/2021. Appendix due on 12/06/2021. [5087443] [21-3079, 21-3081] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 08:30 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. - FOR CAL [5096756] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 11/10/2021 05:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Monte A. Mills for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Ben Stier, Mr. Paul Chard and Mr. Christopher Meyer w/service 09/21/2021 [5078926] [21-3079] (MM) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Katherine M. Swenson for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Ben Stier, Mr. Paul Chard and Mr. Christopher Meyer w/service 09/21/2021 [5078932] [21-3079] (KMS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Matthew A. Kezhaya for Appellant The Satanic Temple w/service 09/21/2021 [5078939] [21-3079] (MAK) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:57 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. - FOR CAL [5096756] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 11/10/2021 05:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5087411-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Matthew A. Kezhaya. Brief of The Satanic Temple due 12/06/2021. Appendix due on 12/06/2021. [5087443] [21-3079, 21-3081] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 08:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/06/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew A. Kezhaya for Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 w/service 10/14/2021. [5087411] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 10/14/2021 05:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record, Certificate of Transcript, and Method of Appendix Preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082066] [21-3079, 21-3081]--[Edited 09/30/2021 by CRJ. ENTRY IS SAME AS 5082065 WITH THE EXCEPTION OF A FOOTER CHANGE FROM STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO DESIGNATION OF RECORD.] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record, Certificate of Transcript, and Method of Appendix Preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082065] [21-3079, 21-3081]--[Edited 09/30/2021 by CRJ. ENTRY EDITED TO ADD ADDITIONAL NOTICES.] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 - w/service 09/29/2021. [5082064] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 09/29/2021 07:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant The Satanic Temple in 21-3079, 21-3081 - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/27/2021 [5081203] [21-3079, 21-3081] (MAK) [Entered: 09/27/2021 05:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Matthew A. Kezhaya for Appellant The Satanic Temple w/service 09/21/2021 [5078939] [21-3079] (MAK) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Katherine M. Swenson for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Ben Stier, Mr. Paul Chard and Mr. Christopher Meyer w/service 09/21/2021 [5078932] [21-3079] (KMS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Monte A. Mills for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Ben Stier, Mr. Paul Chard and Mr. Christopher Meyer w/service 09/21/2021 [5078926] [21-3079] (MM) [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Katherine M. Swenson for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Paul Chard, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Christopher Meyer and Mr. Ben Stier w/service 09/20/2021 [5078623] [21-3079]--[Edited 09/21/2021 by CRJ. COUNSEL HAS REFILED FORM TO LIST INDIVIDUAL NAMES. SEE HISTORY# 5078932 ] (KMS) [Entered: 09/20/2021 05:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Monte A. Mills for Appellees City of Belle Plaine, Mr. Paul Chard, Mr. Cary Coop, Ms. Theresa McDaniel, Mr. Christopher Meyer and Mr. Ben Stier w/service 09/20/2021 [5078621] [21-3079]--[Edited 09/21/2021 by CRJ. COUNSEL HAS REFILED APP FORM TO LIST NAMES REPRESENTED. SEE HISTORY# 5078926. ] (MM) [Entered: 09/20/2021 05:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/26/2021. Appendix due 11/05/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, The Satanic Temple due 11/05/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5077423] [21-3079, 21-3081] (CBO) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order filed 9/15/2021, judgment filed 9/16/2021, and notice of appeal filed 9/16/2021. [5077410] [21-3079] (CBO) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5077401] [21-3079] (CBO) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Satanic Temple, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine M. Swenson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davida Sheri McGhee