Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 06:01:22 (UTC).

The Rumford Free Cath. Library, et al v. Town of Rumford, et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 The Rumford Free Cath Library filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Town of Rumford. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1816

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HEBERT REALTY CO.

LOUISE NASH

LINNELL GERONDA

JENNIFER KRECKEL

WADE RAINEY

LAURA A. PERRY

BRIAN GAGNON

ALAN J. PERRY

THEODORE DILWORTH, III

MICHAEL MILLS

TOWN OF RUMFORD

RICHARD COULOMBE

JOHN W. CONWAY

WILLIAM H. DALE

OXFORD COUNTY BOARD OF ASSESSMENT REVIEW

JARROD CROCKETT

THOMAS BOURRET

Plaintiff / Appellants

PHILIP M. STARK

Cumberland, RI 02864

RUMFORD FREE CATHOLIC LIBRARY

2130 Mendon Rd

Cumberland, RI 02864

PETER TINKHAM

Easton, MA 02334-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nancy Kelly

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

21 Custom House St, 5Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110

Lauren A. Thomas

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

53 Exchange St, Ste 400

South Portland, ME 04106

Mark J. Hoover

Attorney at Pierce Davis & Perritano LLP

10 Post Office Sq, Ste 1100N

Boston, MA 02109-4603

John J. Cloherty III

Attorney at Pierce Davis & Perritano LLP

10 Post Office Sq, Ste 1100N

Boston, MA 02109-4603

Melissa A. Hewey

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101-2480

Krista J. Schmitz

Attorney at Olenn & Penza LLP

530 Greenwich Ave

Warwick, RI 02886-0000

Theodore A. Small

Attorney at Skelton Taintor & Abbott

95 Main St

Auburn, ME 04210

James F. Pross

Attorney at Skelton Taintor & Abbott

95 Main St

Auburn, ME 04210

James M. Bowie

Attorney at Thompson Bowie & Hatch LLC

415 Congress St, Ste 500, Po Box 4630

Portland, ME 04112-4630

Christopher Storm

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Michael Harley Hayden

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Philip M. Stark

2130 Mendon Rd

Cumberland, RI 02864

Rumford Free Catholic Library

2130 Mendon Rd

Cumberland, RI 02864

Peter Tinkham

Po Box 1075

Easton, MA 02334-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered. Plaintiffs-appellants are ordered either to move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or to show cause, in writing filed by October 26, 2020 , why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. On or before October 26, 2020 , counsel must file an appearance form on behalf of the Rumford Free Catholic Library. The failure to comply with this order will lead to Father Philip M. Stark and Peter Francis Tinkham being deemed the sole plaintiffs-appellants in this matter. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 10/05/2020 12:14 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Mark J. Hoover for Town of Rumford, Thomas Bourret, Linnell Geronda, Richard Coulombe, Michael Mills and William H. Dale and Lauren A. Thomas for Hebert Realty Co. and Louise Nash. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 09/18/2020 06:31 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 09/17/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Mark J. Hoover for Town of Rumford, Thomas Bourret, Linnell Geronda, Richard Coulombe, Michael Mills and William H. Dale and Lauren A. Thomas for Hebert Realty Co. and Louise Nash. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:02 AM]

Open Document #4

Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Litigants

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER to Show Cause entered. Plaintiffs-appellants are ordered either to move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or to show cause, in writing filed by October 26, 2020 , why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. On or before October 26, 2020 , counsel must file an appearance form on behalf of the Rumford Free Catholic Library. The failure to comply with this order will lead to Father Philip M. Stark and Peter Francis Tinkham being deemed the sole plaintiffs-appellants in this matter. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 10/05/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Mark J. Hoover for Town of Rumford, Thomas Bourret, Linnell Geronda, Richard Coulombe, Michael Mills and William H. Dale and Lauren A. Thomas for Hebert Realty Co. and Louise Nash. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 09/18/2020 06:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 09/17/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Mark J. Hoover for Town of Rumford, Thomas Bourret, Linnell Geronda, Richard Coulombe, Michael Mills and William H. Dale and Lauren A. Thomas for Hebert Realty Co. and Louise Nash. [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #98) filed by Appellants Rumford Free Catholic Library, Philip M. Stark and Peter Tinkham. Fee due 09/02/2020 . [20-1816] (GB) [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OXFORD COUNTY BOARD OF ASSESSMENT REVIEW is a litigant