This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/21/2020 at 05:16:14 (UTC).

The Puyallup Tribe of Indians v. Pipeline & Hazardous Materials, et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 The Puyallup Tribe of Indians filed an Other lawsuit against Pipeline Hazardous Materials. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-72472

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PUYALLUP TRIBE OF INDIANS

Respondents

HOWARD R. ELLIOTT, in his official capacity as Administrator of Pipeline & Hazardous Materials Safety Administration

ELAINE L. CHAO, in her official capacity as Secretary of Transportation

PIPELINE & HAZARDOUS MATERIALS SAFETY ADMINISTRATION

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Aaron Paul Riensche

Attorney at Ogden Murphy Wallace PLLC

901 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3500

Seattle, WA 98164

Samuel Judge Stiltner

Attorney at Puyallup Tribe of Indians

3009 E. Portland Avenue

Tacoma, WA 98404

Nicholas G. Thomas

Attorney at Ogden Murphy Wallace PLLC

901 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3500

Seattle, WA 98164

Richard A. Du Bey

Attorney at Short Cressman & Burgess PLLC

999 Third Avenue, Suite 3000

Seattle, WA 98104-4088

Respondent Attorney

Paul Maitland Geier

Attorney at United States Department of Transportation

1200 New Jersey Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20590

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Petition for Review

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) COUR TCORRECTION: Added Attorney(s) Nicholas G. Thomas for party(s) Petitioner The Puyallup Tribe of Indians, in case 20-72472. [11796130] (SLM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioner The Puyallup Tribe of Indians Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/26/2020. Petitioner brief due 11/06/2020 for The Puyallup Tribe of Indians. Respondent brief due 12/07/2020 for Elaine L. Chao, Howard R. Elliott, Pipeline & Hazardous Materials Safety Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation and United States of America. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11794570] (JMR) [Entered: 08/19/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration, Administrator of is a litigant

Latest cases where Puyallup Tribe of Indians is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Paul Riensche