This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/26/2021 at 06:14:05 (UTC).

The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 The Prudential Insurance Company of America filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1823

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Claimant

SHENZHEN STONE NETWORK INFORMATION LTD.

Defendants

FRANK ZHANG, a citizen of China

PRU.COM, a domain name

Plaintiff / Appellee

THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Jersey Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorneys

David Christopher Deal

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID C. DEAL PLC

P. O. Box 1042

Crozet, VA 22932

David D. Lin

Attorney at LEWIS & LIN LLC

77 Sands Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Justin Harry Ryann Mercer

Attorney at LEWIS & LIN LLC

77 Sands Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas M. DePalma

8010 Towers Crescent Drive

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

Kevin William Weigand

8010 Towers Crescent Drive

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

Charles Gregory Giger

Attorney at PARTRIDGE PARTNERS, PC

321 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-5011

Mark Van Buren Partridge Esq.

Attorney at PARTRIDGE PARTNERS, PC

321 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-5011

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David C. Deal for Frank Zhang in 21-1822, The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd. in 21-1823. [1001009023] [21-1822, 21-1823] David Deal [Entered: 08/23/2021 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David D. Lin for Frank Zhang in 21-1822, Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd. in 21-1823. [1001009019] [21-1822, 21-1823] David Lin [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin Mercer for Frank Zhang in 21-1822, Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd. in 21-1823. [1001007410] [21-1822, 21-1823] Justin Mercer [Entered: 08/19/2021 08:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Frank Zhang in 21-1822, Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd. in 21-1823 re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 08/23/2021. [21-1822, 21-1823] JSN [Entered: 08/19/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/27/2021. Response Brief due 10/26/2021. [21-1822, 21-1823] JSN [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed consolidating case 21-1823 with 21-1822. Copies to all parties. [1001005432] [21-1822, 21-1823] JSN [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001002060] [21-1823] David Deal [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Shenzhen Stone Network Information Ltd.. [21-1823] David Deal [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001000512] [21-1823] Charles Giger [Entered: 08/09/2021 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark V.B. Partridge for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. [1000997167] [21-1823] Charles Giger [Entered: 08/03/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles G. Giger for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. [1000997166] [21-1823] Charles Giger [Entered: 08/03/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00450-TSE-MSN. [21-1823] JSN [Entered: 07/28/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00450-TSE-MSN. Case manager: JeffNeal. [21-1823] JSN [Entered: 07/28/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Deal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David D. Lin