This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/03/2020 at 06:12:23 (UTC).

The New Georgia Project, et al v. Brad Raffensperger, et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 The New Georgia Project filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Brad Raffensperger. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13360

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

AHN LE, in their official capacities as Members of the Georgia State Election Board

DAVID J. WORLEY

BRAD RAFFENSPERGER, in his official capacity as the Georgia Secretary of State and the Chair of the Georgia State Election Board

REBECCA N. SULLIVAN

MATTHEW MASHBURN

Plaintiff / Appellees

BEVERLY PYNE

CANDACE WOODALL

REAGAN JENNINGS

THE NEW GEORGIA PROJECT

Not Classified By Court and Amicus Curiae

SERVICE

GEORGIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, INC.

Amicus Curiae

STATE OF KENTUCKY

STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA

STATE OF FLORIDA

STATE OF KANSAS

STATE OF NEBRASKA

STATE OF MONTANA

GEORGIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, INC.

STATE OF MISSISSIPPI

STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA

STATE OF TEXAS

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Edward Lake

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante & Littlefield, LLC

500 14Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30318

Josh Belinfante

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante & Littlefield, LLC

500 14Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30318

Alexander Fraser Denton

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante & Littlefield, LLC

500 14Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30318

Carey Allen Miller

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante & Littlefield, LLC

500 14Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30318

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christian Ramses Ruiz

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

2901 N Central Ave Ste 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Halsey G. Knapp Jr.

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 3250

Atlanta, GA 30309

Amanda Rebecca Callais

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 13Th St Nw Ste 800

Washington, DC 20005

Stephanie R. Holstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Adam M. Sparks

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 3250

Atlanta, GA 30309

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

James Clinton Clark Jr.

Attorney at Page Scrantom Sprouse Tucker & Ford, PC

1111 Bay Ave Ste 300, Po Box 1199

Columbus, GA 31902

Gregory C. Sowell

Attorney at Cook & Tolley, LLP

304 E Washington St, Po Box 1927

Athens, GA 30603

Bryan Francis Jacoutot

Attorney at Taylor English Duma, LLP

1600 Parkwood Cir Ste 200

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan P. Tyson

Attorney at Taylor English Duma, LLP

1600 Parkwood Cir Ste 200

Atlanta, GA 30339

William H. Noland

Attorney at Noland Law Firm, LLC

5400 Riverside Dr Ste 205

Macon, GA 31210

Virginia Candace Josey

Attorney at Noland Law Firm, LLC

5400 Riverside Dr Ste 205

Macon, GA 31210

Timothy Michael Boughey

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy Se Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Megan Nicole Martin

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St

Cumming, GA 30040

Alan G. Snipes

Attorney at Page Scrantom Sprouse Tucker & Ford, PC

1111 Bay Ave Ste 300, Po Box 1199

Columbus, GA 31902

Diane Festin LaRoss

Attorney at Taylor English Duma, LLP

1600 Parkwood Cir Ste 200

Atlanta, GA 30339

Rachel Nicole Mack

Attorney at Augusta Law Department

535 Telfair St Bldg 3000

Augusta, GA 30901

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #134

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOver the phone 28-day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Brian Edward Lake for Appellants David J. Worley, Rebecca N. Sullivan, Brad Raffensperger, Matthew Mashburn and Ahn Le. Appellants' brief is due on 12/10/2020, with the appendix due (7) days thereafter. [Entered: 10/28/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. The appellants' brief is due on or before 11/12/2020, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Elizabeth Cohn, Filer: Brad Raffensperger, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 10/01/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 08/19/2020. [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Honest Elections Project. [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrected Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Honest Elections Project. [20-13360] (ECF: Jason Torchinsky) [Entered: 10/02/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLISHED ORDER: Motion for stay of injunction filed by Appellants David J. Worley, Rebecca N. Sullivan, Brad Raffensperger, Matthew Mashburn and Ahn Le is GRANTED. [see order for complete tex] [ # 9192131-2 ] CRW, BCG and BL; Lagoa, concurring; Wilson, dissenting [Entered: 10/02/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for leave to file amicus brief of Honest Elections Project is GRANTED.ENTERED FOR THE COURT-BY DIRECTION [ # 9199284-2 ]--[Edited 10/02/2020 by JLT] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to response filed by Appellants Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. [20-13360] (ECF: Josh Belinfante) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Jason Torchinsky for The Honest Elections Project. [9199284-1] [20-13360] (ECF: Jason Torchinsky) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Torchinsky for The Honest Elections Project [20-13360] (ECF: Jason Torchinsky) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc Erik Elias for Reagan Jennings, Beverly Pyne, The New Georgia Project and Candace Woodall. [20-13360] (ECF: Marc Elias) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Brad Raffensperger, Court Reporter: Elizabeth Cohn, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 08/19/2020. [Entered: 09/17/2020 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Vincent R. Russo for Appellants Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-13360] (ECF: Vincent Russo) [Entered: 09/16/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Edward Lake for Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. [20-13360] (ECF: Brian Lake) [Entered: 09/15/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Josh Belinfante for Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. [20-13360] (ECF: Josh Belinfante) [Entered: 09/15/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Vincent R. Russo for Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley. [20-13360] (ECF: Vincent Russo) [Entered: 09/15/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sabzevari, Ali A for Carol Wesley, Dorthy Foster Hall, Patricia Pullar, Darlene Johnson, Diane Givens, in official capacity as members of Clayton County Board of Elections and Registrations (Not Party) [20-13360] (ECF: Arash Sabzevari) [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack Reynolds Hancock for Service. [20-13360] (ECF: Jack Hancock) [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 09/04/2020 as to Appellant Ahn Le. [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Ahn Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley on 09/04/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/18/2020 as to Appellant Ahn Le. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/02/2020 as to Appellee Reagan Jennings [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Georgia Republican Party, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The New Georgia Project is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Harris Noland