This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/13/2021 at 05:57:47 (UTC).

The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, et al v. SEC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1050

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Nasdaq PHLX LLC

The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC

Nasdaq BX, Inc.

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Joshua M. Wesneski

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Amir Cameron Tayrani

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Respondent Attorneys

Dominick V. Freda

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Daniel Staroselsky

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Martin Totaro

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1884554] filed by Martin Totaro and co-counsel Dominick Freda; Daniel Staroselsky on behalf of Respondent SEC in 21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053. [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884487] filed consolidating cases 21-1051, 21-1053 (Consolidation started 02/09/2021) with 21-1050; directing party to file in 21-1050 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021 [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1884468] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1884466-2 ] [21-1050] [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1884466] of a decision by federal agency filed by Nasdaq BX, Inc., Nasdaq PHLX LLC and The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC [Service Date: 02/05/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1050] [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1050] [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASDAQ OMX GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominick V. Freda

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Staroselsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Totaro