This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 06:12:58 (UTC).

The Miller Law Firm, LLC, et al v. Laborde Earles Law Firm, et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 The Miller Law Firm, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Laborde Earles Law Firm. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16228

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Appellants

THE MILLER LAW FIRM, LLC

WEITZ & LUXENBERG

Appellees

LABORDE EARLES LAW FIRM

BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD, LLP

PENDLEY BAUDIN & COFFIN, LLP

CAREY DANIS & LOWE

HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC

LANIER LAW FIRM, P.C.

TAUTFEST BOND, PLLC

WATTS GUERRA, LLP

NAPOLI SHKOLNIK, PLLC

GOLDSTEIN & RUSSELL, P.C.

BEASELY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS AND MILES, P.C.

FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

JOHNSON LAW GROUP

THE GORI LAW FIRM, P.C.

ONDER LAW, LLC

SINGELTON SCHREIBER MCKENZIE & SCOTT

Not Classified By Court

In re: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael J. Miller Esquire

Attorney at Miller Law Firm, LLC

108 Railroad Avenue

Orange, VA 22960

Alani Golanski

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas Rockforte

Attorney at Laborde Earles Law Firm

1901 Kaliste Saloom Road

Lafayette, LA 70508

Madeleine Brumley

Attorney at Laborde Earles Law Firm

1901 Kaliste Saloom Road

Lafayette, LA 70508

Daniel C. Burke

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard, LLP

10 E. 40Th St.

New York, NY 10016

Christopher L. Coffin

Attorney at Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2505

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jeffrey A. Lamken

Attorney at MoloLamken, LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20037

Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire

Attorney at NSPR Law Services, LLC

270 Munoz Rivera Avenue, Suite 201

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Eric F. Citron

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

William Sutton

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis and Miles, PC

P.O. Box 4160, 218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Sherri Ann Saucer

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Behram Viraf Parekh

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

515 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bradford J. Gilde

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at The Gori Law Firm, PC

156 N Main Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

James G. Onder

Attorney at Onder Law, LLC

110 E Lockwood Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63119-3003

Timothy Allen Scott

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber McKenzie & Scott, LLP

450 A Street, 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

Andrew W. Hutton Esquire

Attorney at Andrew W. Hutton, Attorney at Law

550 West B Street 4Th Floor, Pmb 180

San Diego, CA 92101

Eric Boss

Attorney at Pulaski Kherkher, PLLC

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1725

Houston, TX 77098

Karen Barth Menzies

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group, LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Fletcher Trammel

Attorney at Trammell, P.C.

3262 Westheimer Rd., Suite 423

Houston, TX 77098

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) Added Attorney(s) Eric Richard Nitz for party(s) Appellee Tautfest Bond, PLLC Appellee Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC Appellee Watts Guerra, LLP Appellee Lanier Law Firm, P.C. Appellee Carey Danis & Lowe, in case 21-16228. [12230524] (RR) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Eric R. Nitz (MoloLamken, 600 New Hampshire Avenue, NW, Suite 500, Washington, DC 20037) for Appellees Carey Danis & Lowe, Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Lanier Law Firm, P.C., Tautfest Bond, PLLC and Watts Guerra, LLP. Date of service: 09/15/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12229868] [21-16228] (Nitz, Eric) [Entered: 09/15/2021 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Leonid Grinberg for party(s) Appellee Tautfest Bond, PLLC Appellee Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC Appellee Watts Guerra, LLP Appellee Lanier Law Firm, P.C. Appellee Carey Danis & Lowe, in case 21-16228. [12229841] (RR) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Leonid Grinberg (MoloLamken LLP, 430 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10022) for Appellees Carey Danis & Lowe, Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Lanier Law Firm, P.C., Tautfest Bond, PLLC and Watts Guerra, LLP. Date of service: 09/15/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12229820] [21-16228] (Grinberg, Leonid) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12211826] (BLS) [Entered: 08/25/2021 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/24/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12190416] (BLS) [Entered: 08/03/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that the order challenged in this appeal may not be final or appealable under 28 U.S.C. 1291. Accordingly, in addition to all other issues the parties wish to raise in their briefs, the parties shall address the basis for this courts jurisdiction to review the challenged order. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [12188133] (WL) [Entered: 07/30/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/28/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12185555]. [21-16228] (AD) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Weitz & Luxenberg Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/28/2021. [12185445] [21-16228] (Golanski, Alani) [Entered: 07/28/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Arati C. Furness in 21-16228 substituted by Attorney Sherri Ann Saucer in 21-16228 [12183750] (QDL) [Entered: 07/27/2021 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sherri Ann Saucer (Fears Nachawati, PLLC, 5473 Blair Rd, Dallas, TX 75231) for Appellee Fears Nachawati, PLLC. Substitution for Attorney Arati C. Furness for Appellee Fears Nachawati, PLLC. Date of service: 07/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12183742] [21-16228] (Saucer, Sherri) [Entered: 07/27/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants The Miller Law Firm, LLC and Weitz & Luxenberg Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/02/2021. Transcript ordered by 08/24/2021. Transcript due 09/23/2021. Appellants The Miller Law Firm, LLC and Weitz & Luxenberg opening brief due 11/02/2021. Appellees Beasely Allen Crow Methvin Portis and Miles, P.C., Bernstein Liebhard, LLP, Carey Danis & Lowe, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller, LLP, Fears Nachawati, PLLC, Gibbs Law Group, LLP, Goldberg & Osborne, LLP, Goldstein & Russell, P.C., Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, LLC, Johnson Law Group, Kirkendall Dwyer, LLP, Laborde Earles Law Firm, Lanier Law Firm, P.C., Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC, Onder Law, LLC, Pendley Baudin & Coffin, LLP, Pulaski Kherkher PLLC, Romanucci & Blandin, LLC, Singelton Schreiber McKenzie & Scott, Tautfest Bond, PLLC, The Gori Law Firm, P.C., Trammell, P.C. and Watts Guerra, LLP answering brief due 12/02/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12183148] (RT) [Entered: 07/26/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Napoli Shkolnik PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Watts Guerra, LLP is a litigant