This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:05:26 (UTC).

The Cincinnati Specialty Under v. Jeffrey Wood, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 The Cincinnati Specialty Under filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jeffrey Wood. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35124

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

MILIONIS CONSTRUCTION INC., a Washington Corporation

Defendant / Appellants

JEFFREY WOOD, individually and as assignee of Stephen Milionis and Milionis Construction, Inc.

ANNA WOOD, individually and as assignee of Stephen Milionis and Milionis Construction, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellee

THE CINCINNATI SPECIALTY UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Kevin W. Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Freeborn, PLLC

1325 W. 1St Avenue, Suite 303

Spokane, WA 99201

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah E. Davenport

Attorney at Soha & Lang, PS

1325 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Gary Sparling

Attorney at Soha & Lang, PS

1325 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 04/15/2020. See order for details. [11648522] (LW) [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:19 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE DIAL IN- Assessment Conference, 03/18/2020, 1:30 pm Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 03/18/2020 ). [11629744] (LW) [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:58 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/18/2020, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11606622] (LW) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:56 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeffrey Wood and Anna Wood Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11602823] [20-35124] (Roberts, Kevin) [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:36 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 04/15/2020. See order for details. [11648522] (LW) [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE DIAL IN- Assessment Conference, 03/18/2020, 1:30 pm Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 03/18/2020 ). [11629744] (LW) [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/18/2020, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11606622] (LW) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11603295]. [20-35124] (AD) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeffrey Wood and Anna Wood Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11602823] [20-35124] (Roberts, Kevin) [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Anna Wood and Jeffrey Wood Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/20/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/13/2020. Transcript due 04/13/2020. Appellants Anna Wood and Jeffrey Wood opening brief due 05/22/2020. Appellee The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596282] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less