This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

The Cincinnati Insurance Co. v. Richfield Corporation, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 The Cincinnati Insurance Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Richfield Corporation, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1767

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Appellants

TRANSPORTATION TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. (RICHFIELD), dba Richfield Industries

TRASK SIMPSON

RICHFIELD CORPORATION, INC.

CORSAIR ENGINEERING, INC.

TRANSPORTATION TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. (DELTA), dba Delta Wire U.S.A.

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

TRASK SIMPSON

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorney

Joseph N. Fraser

Attorney at Johnston, Sztykiel & Hunt

3250 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 500

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert H. Darling

Attorney at Law Office

217 Ann Arbor Road, Suite 302

Plymouth, MI 48170

Brian T. Smith

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Brian Thomas Smith

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Kelly R. Houk

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Trent Bryce Collier

Attorney at Law Offices

4000 Town Center, Suite 909

Southfield, MI 48075

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019. appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:44 PM]

#22

(#22) A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details.] [19-1767, 19-1768] (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:43 PM]

#21

(#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/16/2019;. appellee brief due 10/16/2019; (CB) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

20 #2

letter sent

20 #1

Letter

#19

(#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company by Trent B. Collier. Certificate of Service: 08/05/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:14 AM]

#15

(#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Trent Bryce Collier for Appellant, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Certificate of Service:07/30/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:50 PM]

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Trent Bryce Collier for Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:49 AM]

#13

(#13) LETTER SENT to parties sending corrected caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:22 PM]

#12

(#12) LETTER SENT to parties with corrected caption. (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:12 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Brian T. Smith. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2019. [19-1767] (BTS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:02 PM]

#10

(#10) LETTER SENT to all counsel 19-1767, regarding new caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:06 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:51 PM]

#7

(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 6 ], filed by Ms. Kelly R. Houk for General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 07/23/2019. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:58 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767, 19-1768]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CB] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:40 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Transcript needed: n. (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:24 AM]

#5

(#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/08/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:31 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019. appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details.] [19-1767, 19-1768] (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/16/2019;. appellee brief due 10/16/2019; (CB) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) LETTER SENT to all counsel regarding corrected caption on appeal. (PJE) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company by Trent B. Collier. Certificate of Service: 08/05/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Trent Bryce Collier for Appellant, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Certificate of Service:07/30/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Trent Bryce Collier for Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1767]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER SENT to parties sending corrected caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER SENT to parties with corrected caption. (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Brian T. Smith. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2019. [19-1767] (BTS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER SENT to all counsel 19-1767, regarding new caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#9) Update fee status change to paid. Receipt No: 0645-7313639 (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 6 ], filed by Ms. Kelly R. Houk for General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 07/23/2019. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767, 19-1768]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CB] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/08/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#3) The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski [19-1768, 19-1766, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Transcript needed: n. (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.