This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:12 (UTC).

The Cincinnati Insurance Co., et al v. Richfield Corporation, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 The Cincinnati Insurance Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Richfield Corporation, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1768

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

TRASK SIMPSON

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Defendant / Appellants and Not Yet Classified

TRANSPORTATION TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. (RICHFIELD), dba Richfield Industries

RICHFIELD CORPORATION, INC.

CORSAIR ENGINEERING, INC.

TRANSPORTATION TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. (DELTA), dba Delta Wire U.S.A.

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Joseph N. Fraser

Attorney at Johnston, Sztykiel & Hunt

3250 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 500

Troy, MI 48084

Trent Bryce Collier

Attorney at Law Offices

4000 Town Center, Suite 909

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Thomas Smith

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Kelly R. Houk

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019. appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:45 PM]

#22

(#20) A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details.] [19-1767, 19-1768] (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:43 PM]

#19

(#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Brian T. Smith. Certificate of Service: 08/07/2019. [19-1768] (BTS) [Entered: 08/07/2019 12:27 PM]

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/16/2019;. appellee brief due 10/16/2019; (CB) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:52 AM]

17 #1

letter sent

17 #2

Letter

#15

(#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield) in 19-1767, Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellees Cross-Appellants Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield), Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta), Corsair Engineering, Inc. and Richfield Corporation, Inc. Certificate of Service:07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (JNF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:08 PM]

14 #1

corporate disclosure

14 #2

corporate disclosure

14 #3

corporate disclosure

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield) by Joseph N. Fraser. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (JNF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:00 PM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#13

(#9) LETTER SENT to parties sending corrected caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:22 PM]

#12

(#8) LETTER SENT to parties with corrected caption. (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:12 AM]

#10

(#7) LETTER SENT to all counsel 19-1767, regarding new caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:06 PM]

#7

(#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Ms. Kelly R. Houk for General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 07/23/2019. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:58 PM]

#6

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767, 19-1768]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CB] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:40 PM]

#5

(#4) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/08/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:31 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019. appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details.] [19-1767, 19-1768] (LMR) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Brian T. Smith. Certificate of Service: 08/07/2019. [19-1768] (BTS) [Entered: 08/07/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/16/2019;. appellee brief due 10/16/2019; (CB) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER SENT to parties regarding corrected parties on appeal (PJE) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield) in 19-1767, Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellees Cross-Appellants Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield), Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta), Corsair Engineering, Inc. and Richfield Corporation, Inc. Certificate of Service:07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (JNF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield) in 19-1767, Attorney Mr. Joseph N. Fraser for Appellees Cross-Appellants Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield), Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta), Corsair Engineering, Inc. and Richfield Corporation, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (JNF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield) by Joseph N. Fraser. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (JNF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ***LOCKED - not a party to this appeal*** APPEARANCE filed for The Cincinnati Insurance Company by Trent B. Collier. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2019. [19-1768]--[Edited 08/06/2019 by PJE] (TBC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER SENT to parties sending corrected caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER SENT to parties with corrected caption. (CB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER SENT to all counsel 19-1767, regarding new caption [19-1767, 19-1768] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Ms. Kelly R. Houk for General Motors, LLC in 19-1766, 19-1767 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 07/23/2019. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee General Motors, LLC by Kelly R. Houk. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1766, 19-1767, 19-1768]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CB] (KRH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/08/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. [19-1766, 19-1768, 19-1767] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski [19-1768, 19-1766, 19-1767] (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Corsair Engineering, Inc., Richfield Corporation, Inc., Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Delta) and Transportation Technology Group, Inc. (Richfield). Transcript needed: n. (CB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.