This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/24/2022 at 13:44:06 (UTC).

The California Institute v. Broadcom Limited

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 The California Institute filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Broadcom Limited. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1527

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

BROADCOM CORPORATION

AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

BROADCOM LIMITED

APPLE INC.

BROADCOM LIMITED, nka Broadcom Inc.

AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED, nka Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited

Plaintiff / Appellee

THE CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

William F. Lee

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Lauren B. Fletcher

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Steven Jared Horn

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Madeleine C. Laupheimer

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Joseph J. Mueller

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Mark D. Selwyn

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

2600 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

David P. Yin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kathleen M. Sullivan

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

James R. Asperger

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

865 S Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brian P. Biddinger

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Todd Michael Briggs Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Edward J. DeFranco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Kevin P.B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Derek L. Shaffer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

1300 I Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kevin Alexander Smith

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

#14

#15

#17

(#17) OPINION filed for the court by Lourie, Circuit Judge; Linn, Circuit Judge and Dyk, Circuit Judge. Dyk, Circuit Judge, concurring-in-part and dissenting-inpart. Precedential Opinion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [828979] [20-2222, 21-1527] [MVH] [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:16 AM]

#18

(#18) JUDGMENT. AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: Each Side Bears Its Own Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [828982] [20-2222, 21-1527] [MVH] [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:17 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JUDGMENT. AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: Each Side Bears Its Own Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [828982] [20-2222, 21-1527] [MVH] [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) OPINION filed for the court by Lourie, Circuit Judge; Linn, Circuit Judge and Dyk, Circuit Judge. Dyk, Circuit Judge, concurring-in-part and dissenting-inpart. Precedential Opinion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [828979] [20-2222, 21-1527] [MVH] [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#16) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 20-2222 Lead with 21-1527 Consolidated Member Case. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [755951] [20-2222, 21-1527] [EKD] [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting motions to consolidate appeals [ # 753614-2 ] [ # 14 ] filed by Appellants. The appeals are consolidated. The revised caption is reflected above. The California Institute of Technology's response brief in these appeals is due no later than March 11, 2021. No later than seven days from the date of filing of this order, Appellants are directed to file a corrected opening brief that includes the revised caption. A copy of this order shall be transmitted to the merits panel assigned to these appeals. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [755915] [20-2222, 21-1527] [LMS] [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION of Appellants Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited and Apple Inc. to consolidate appeals (No. 21-1527 with No. 20-2222). Service: 02/03/2021 by email. [753617] [21-1527] [William Lee] [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORRECTED ORDER: correcting clerk order to modify the official caption [12],clerk order [12]; reason(s): to add The to appellee's name. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [752072] [20-2222, 21-1527] [LMS] [Entered: 01/27/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORDER modifying the official caption. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [752051] [20-2222, 21-1527] [LMS] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Kevin A. Smith as counsel for Appellee California Institute of Technology. Service: 01/25/2021 by email. [751637] [21-1527] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee California Institute of Technology. Service: 01/25/2021 by email. [751633] [21-1527] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee California Institute of Technology. Service: 01/25/2021 by email. [751632] [21-1527] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Kathleen M. Sullivan; Derek L. Shaffer; James R. Asperger; Kevin P.B. Johnson; Edward J. DeFranco; Todd M. Briggs; Brian P. Biddinger as counsel for Appellee California Institute of Technology. Service: 01/25/2021 by email. [751630] [21-1527]--[Edited 01/27/2021 by EKD to correct docket text] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE of Appellants Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Avago Technologies Limited and Apple Inc. to the clerk order for other relief [ # 3 ] , clerk order to set case manager tickler date [ # 3 ] , clerk order [ # 3 ]. Service: 01/22/2021 by email. [751168] [21-1527] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Avago Technologies Limited and Apple Inc.. Service: 01/22/2021 by email. [751162] [21-1527] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Avago Technologies Limited and Apple Inc.. Service: 01/22/2021 by email. [751158] [21-1527] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for William F. Lee; Mark D. Selwyn; Joseph J. Mueller; Lauren B. Fletcher; Madeleine C. Laupheimer; Steven J. Horn; David P. Yin as counsel for Appellants Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Avago Technologies Limited and Apple Inc.. Service: 01/22/2021 by email. [751152] [21-1527] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Within seven days of the date of filing of this order, Appellants are directed to inform the court whether the captions for these appeals should be revised. The California Institute of Technology may file a reply no later than three days thereafter. (See order) Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [749894] [20-2222, 21-1527] [NL] [Entered: 01/15/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 20-2222 and 21-1527. [749778] [20-2222, 21-1527] [EKD] [Entered: 01/15/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/08/2021. [748445] Entry of Appearance is due on 01/25/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/25/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 01/25/2021. Appellants' brief is due on 03/12/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avago Technologies U.S. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcom. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant