This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/22/2021 at 06:04:23 (UTC).

Brown Jug, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Brown Jug, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2644

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellants

THE BROWN JUG, INC., dba The Little Brown Jug, Inc., dba The Backroom

BROWN JUG, INC., dba Little Brown Jug, Inc., dba Backroom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Dennis M. Dolan

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Bradford S. Moyer

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

333 Bridge Street, N.W., Suite 530

Grand Rapids, MI 49504

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lawrence J. Buckfire

Attorney at Buckfire & Buckfire

17117 W. Nine Mile Road, Suite 1035

Southfield, MI 48078-0000

James Joseph Kelly

Attorney at Law Office

30300 Northwestern Highway, Suite 324

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Chelsea Ventures, LLC in 21-2715, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. in 21-2644, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Dino Drop, Inc., Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC, Bucaroo Too, LLC and 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. in 21-2718. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2715, 21-2644, 21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 08/16/2021 06:55 PM]

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/16/2021; appellee brief due 09/15/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:16 PM]

17 #2

clerk order filed

17 #1

Cover Letter

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (DMD) [Entered: 07/23/2021 05:10 PM]

#15

(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. to consolidate cases Case No. 21-2644, The Brown Jug, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company; Case No. 21-2715, Chelsea Ventures, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, Case No. 21-2718, Dino Drop, Inc., et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:27 PM]

#14

(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:24 PM]

#13

(#13) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 9:00 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:02 PM]

#10

(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc... Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:55 AM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:44 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc. by James J. Kelly. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:42 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Dennis M. Dolan. Certificate of Service: 06/30/2021. [21-2644] (DMD) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:36 PM]

#15

(#17) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 15 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 6644702-2 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

#13

(#17) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 15 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 6644702-2 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:24 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 06/24/2021. [21-2644] (BSM) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:16 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/02/2021; appellee brief due 09/01/2021. (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:08 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:05 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Chelsea Ventures, LLC in 21-2715, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. in 21-2644, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Dino Drop, Inc., Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC, Bucaroo Too, LLC and 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. in 21-2718. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2715, 21-2644, 21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 08/16/2021 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#19) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/03/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/16/2021; appellee brief due 09/15/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 15 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 6644702-2 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (DMD) [Entered: 07/23/2021 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. to consolidate cases Case No. 21-2644, The Brown Jug, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company; Case No. 21-2715, Chelsea Ventures, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, Case No. 21-2718, Dino Drop, Inc., et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 9:00 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2644] (DMD) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for The Brown Jug, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc... Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc. by James J. Kelly. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-2644] (JJK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Dennis M. Dolan. Certificate of Service: 06/30/2021. [21-2644] (DMD) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 06/24/2021. [21-2644] (BSM) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/02/2021; appellee brief due 09/01/2021. (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant The Brown Jug, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J. Kelly