This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/23/2022 at 05:42:24 (UTC).

The Broad Institute, Inc. v. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 The Broad Institute, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1653

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

THE BROAD INSTITUTE, INC.

MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE

Appellees

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

UNIVERSITY OF VIENNA

EMMANUELLE CHARPENTIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Raymond Nimrod

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Appellee Attorney

Eldora Ellison Ph.D.

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are associated: 22-1594 (Lead) with 22-1653 (Cross-Appeal). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [843430] [22-1594, 22-1653] [ALK] [Entered: 04/15/2022 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/13/2022. [843425] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/29/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/29/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/29/2022. Certified List is due on 05/25/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 04/15/2022 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where The President And Fellows of Harvard College is a litigant

Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY is a litigant