This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2019 at 06:08:34 (UTC).

The Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 The Bank of New York Mellon filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15616

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Successor in Interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6, FKA The Bank of New York

Defendant

STONE CANYON WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Counter Claimant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Cross Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC

JUAN A. CHACON

3Rd Party Defendant

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Thera A. Cooper Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jared Sechrist

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Howard C. Kim

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Karen Hanks

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Diana S. Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on June 25, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before August 5, 2019; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before September 4, 2019; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11313800] (JPD) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:51 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on May 29, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before July 2, 2019; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before August 1, 2019; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11283958] (HC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:21 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 05/01/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11261250] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:26 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon Correspondence: BoNYM is not requesting the preparation of any additional transcripts for this appeal.. Date of service: 04/08/2019 [11256149] [19-15616] (Cooper, Thera) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:29 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/08/2019. [11256127] [19-15616] (Cooper, Thera) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:19 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on June 25, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before August 5, 2019; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before September 4, 2019; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11313800] (JPD) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#13) Terminated Stephen Colmery Parsley for The Bank of New York Mellon in 19-15616 [11313609] (CW) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#12) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen Colmery Parsley, Esquire for Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 05/29/2019. [11312297] [19-15616] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#11) Added attorney Jared Sechrist for The Bank of New York Mellon, in case 19-15616. [11290953] (CW) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jared M. Sechrist for Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon. Date of service: 05/08/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11290749] [19-15616] (Sechrist, Jared) [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • (#9) Terminated Thera A. Cooper for The Bank of New York Mellon in 19-15616 (due to incorrect ECF contact information). [11285102] (RY) [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on May 29, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before July 2, 2019; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before August 1, 2019; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11283958] (HC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 05/01/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11261250] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#6) Added attorney Stephen Colmery Parsley for appellant The Bank of New York Mellon, in case 19-15616. [11259869] (HH) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley for Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon. Date of service: 04/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11259685] [19-15616] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • (#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11257064] (AD) [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon Correspondence: BoNYM is not requesting the preparation of any additional transcripts for this appeal.. Date of service: 04/08/2019 [11256149] [19-15616] (Cooper, Thera) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/08/2019. [11256127] [19-15616] (Cooper, Thera) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/09/2019. Appellant The Bank of New York Mellon opening brief due 05/31/2019. Appellee SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC answering brief due 07/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11249875] (JBS) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less